Sena v. Officer Coleman CCDC et al
Plaintiff: Terrie L. Sena
Defendant: Officer Clinkscales CCDC and Officer Coleman CCDC
Case Number: 2:2015cv02066
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that 35 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Replies due by 6/20/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that 26 Motion to Extend Time is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 27 and 28 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Take Depositions are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the parties must file a joint discovery plan and scheduling order no later than August 3, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Motion to Extend Time to File a Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 17 replaced on 7/14/2016 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sena v. Officer Coleman CCDC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Clinkscales CCDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Coleman CCDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie L. Sena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?