Tagle v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Defendant: NDOC and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2015cv02082
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Revoking in forma pauperis status 106 USCA Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER denying 85 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER denying 87 Motion; ORDER granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 100 Motion; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due 30 days from date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Strike; ORDER granting 60 Motion to Strike; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Court's Investigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 44 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 27 Motion.; denying 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.; denying 36 Motion.; denying 37 Motion.; denying 38 Motion for Hearing.; denying 41 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 20 Tagle's motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagle v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?