SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. and Prona Tools, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv02111
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Filing 79 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Order) (MMM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting #77 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 6, 2017 Filing 77 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and Permanent Injunction; filed by Counter Defendant SATA GmbH & Co. KG, Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
July 6, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Non Compliance with LR IC 2-2(c) and Attorney Action Required to Document #75 : ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Steven Anthony Caloiaro CORRECTION: As directed by Order #74 attorney to submit a Stipulation for Dismissal or Status Report. Attorney advised to refile documents #75 using the correct Stipulation event, in accordance with Order #74 and pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). Document #75 is terminated as filed in error. (no image attached)(RFJ)
July 6, 2017 Filing 75 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event and properly establish docket entry relationship. Submission of PROPOSED ORDER; filed by Counter Defendant SATA GmbH & Co. KG, Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven) Document #75 is terminated as filed in error. Modified on 7/6/2017 (RFJ).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that the parties file a joint status report or a stipulation to dismiss by July 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting #70 SECOND STIPULATION to Stay Discovery until 6/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 5/17/2017 to reflect correct date signed (MMM).
May 16, 2017 Filing 72 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
May 15, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Non Compliance with LR IC 2-2 and Attorney Action Required to #70 Stipulation: ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney Steven Anthony Caloiaro, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b): "For each type of relief requested or purpose of the document, a separate document must be filed and a separate event must be selected for that document" . CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to only file the Status Report contained in document #70 as separate filing, using the appropriate event pursuant to LR IC 2-2 (b) and LR IC 2-2(c). (no image attached)(RFJ)
May 15, 2017 Filing 70 SECOND STIPULATION to Stay Discovery; filed by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
April 18, 2017 Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 4/18/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting #67 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 10, 2017 Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by Counter Claimant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd., Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Jane)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting #64 STIPULATION to Stay Discovery. FURTHER ORDERED that by May 11, 2017, the parties must file a stipulated dismissal or a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 24, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #64 Stipulation by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Caloiaro, Steven)
March 24, 2017 Filing 64 STIPULATION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven) Corrected image #65 attached on 3/24/2017 (DKJ).
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Steven A. Caloiaro is substituted in place of Michael D Rounds and Emily Anne Ellis for SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
February 3, 2017 Filing 61 ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG.(Caloiaro, Steven)
January 13, 2017 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SATA Holding GmbH for SATA GmbH & Co. KG added. . (Caloiaro, Steven)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting #58 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Answer/Respond re #47 ANSWER/COUNTERCLAIM. SATA GmbH & Co. KG answer due 2/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2017 Filing 58 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven) Modified on 1/4/2017 to establish docket entry relationship (DKJ).
December 8, 2016 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Prona Tools, Inc. served on 11/14/2016, answer due 12/5/2016. (Caloiaro, Steven)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting #54 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Answer/Respond re #47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. SATA GmbH & Co. KG answer due 1/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Yin Huang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2016 Filing 54 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #47 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, ; by Counter Defendant SATA GmbH & Co. KG, Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
December 5, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Prona Tools, Inc. by Yin Huang by Defendant Prona Tools, Inc.. (Clement, Chad)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting #51 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Submit Proposed Discovery Plan & Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 29, 2016 Filing 51 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Parties to Submit Proposed Discovery Plan & Scheduling Order by Counter Defendant SATA GmbH & Co. KG, Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
November 8, 2016 Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/8/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. Counsel Yin Huang's ("Counsel") Verified Petition was due in this matter on February 22, 2016. On March 2, 2016, the Court sua sponte provided Counsel with an extension until March 31, 2016. To date, Counsel still has failed to submit the Verified Petition for permission to practice in this Court. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counsel Yin Huang shall show cause as to why a Verified Petition has not yet been filed. Counsel shall submit a Verified Petition no later than December 5, 2016. Failure to submit a Verified Petition by the deadline shall result in the termination of Counsel on the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting #48 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer/Respond re #47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. SATA GmbH & Co. KG answer due 12/5/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 3, 2016 Filing 48 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #47 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, ; by Counter Defendant SATA GmbH & Co. KG, Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
October 10, 2016 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against SATA GmbH & Co. KG filed by Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd..(Fee, J.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 15, 2016 Filing 46 Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Jane Wise and Jordana Rubel are in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that #27 Motion to Dismiss and Quash for Insufficient Service of Process is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #26 Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Entry of Default is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's entry of default against Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. (ECF No. #19 ) is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that #30 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #21 Motion to Quash Service of Summons is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG must serve Defendant Prona within 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #41 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for James W. Wise and approving Designation of Local Counsel C. Erik Hawes. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/1/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting #40 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Jordana S. Rubel and approving Designation of Local Counsel, C. Erik Hawes. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/27/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #39 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for J. Kevin Fee and approving Designation of Local Counsel, C. Erik Hawes. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/27/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 25, 2016 Filing 41 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jane Wise and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel C. Erik Hawes (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4134889) by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. (Hawes, Clay)
May 25, 2016 Filing 40 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jordana Rubel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel C. Erik Hawes (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4133477) by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. (Hawes, Clay)
May 25, 2016 Filing 39 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by J. Kevin Fee and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel C. Erik Hawes (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4133470) by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. (Hawes, Clay)
April 28, 2016 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #30 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven A. Caloiaro, Esq.)(Caloiaro, Steven)
April 18, 2016 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #30 Motion for Default Judgment,, filed by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 4/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane W. Wise)(Hawes, Clay)
April 11, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel J. Kevin Fee, Jordana S. Rubel, Jane W. Wise to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 5/26/2016. (no image attached) (DKJ)
April 11, 2016 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #27 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement al Declaration of Della Chen)(Hawes, Clay)
April 11, 2016 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #26 Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement al Declaration of Della Chen)(Hawes, Clay)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan C. Chen and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad F. Clement for Prona Tools, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2016 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Set Aside, filed by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Rounds, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #27 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Roy McMahan)(Rounds, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Daniel Maier, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration Steven A. Caloiaro, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Rounds, Michael)
March 31, 2016 Filing 29 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alan C. Chen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad F. Clement (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4059919) filed by Defendant Prona Tools, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clement, Chad)
March 17, 2016 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. (Hawes, Clay) Modified to reflect correct event on 3/17/2016 (DKJ).
March 17, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss and Quash for Insufficient Service of Process by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 4/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Della Chen)(Hawes, Clay)
March 17, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION to Set Aside #19 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 4/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Della Chen)(Hawes, Clay)
March 2, 2016 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 3/2/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. RE: 25 Notice for Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition for permission to practice in this court. On January 8, 2016, a NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2, was sent to Counsel Alan C. Chen and Yin Huang, to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. Said Verified Petition was due on February 22, 2016. To date, counsel has failed to submit their Verified Petitions for permission to practice in this Court. Counsel is directed to submit their Verified Petitions no later than March 31, 2016.Counsel is further directed to use the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov.Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register Attorneys.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 8, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Alan C. Chen and Yin Huang to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 2/22/2016. (no image attached) (DKJ)
January 7, 2016 Filing 24 ERRATA to #23 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Prona Tools, Inc.. (Clement, Chad)
January 7, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Quash, filed by Defendant Prona Tools, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clement, Chad)
December 28, 2015 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Quash,, filed by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Replies due by 1/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven A. Caloiaro, Esq., #2 Declaration of Roy Mcmahan)(Caloiaro, Steven)
December 11, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons by Defendant Prona Tools, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jierong Cao in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Jiang in Support, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Chung in Support)(Clement, Chad)
December 3, 2015 Filing 20 ERRATA to #13 Summons Returned Executed ; upon Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co. filed by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Caloiaro, Steven)
December 3, 2015 Filing 19 VACATED per #45 ORDER Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. re #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default,. (MMM)
December 3, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Caloiaro, Steven)
December 3, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. ERROR: Default form not provided. CORRECTION: Attorney Steven Caloiaro advised: 1. To download and complete "Default" form, from the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov. 2. Refile the Default form using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document event, found under the Notices category and link to #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default.(no image attached)(DKJ)
December 3, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against Defendant Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Steven A. Caloiaro)(Caloiaro, Steven) Default form #18 attached on 12/3/2015 (DKJ).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer/Respond re #1 Complaint. Prona Tools, Inc. answer due12/11/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 12/1/2015 to reflect correct answer due date (MMM).
November 25, 2015 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, ; by Defendant Prona Tools, Inc.. (Clement, Chad)
November 10, 2015 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG re #1 Complaint,. Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/26/2015. (Caloiaro, Steven)
November 10, 2015 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG re #1 Complaint,. Prona Tools, Inc. served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/27/2015. (Caloiaro, Steven)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 5, 2015 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/5/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 4, 2015 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/4/2015. Due to error reassigning by Clerk's Office, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-02111-GMN-CWH. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 4, 2015 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/4/2015. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-02111-JAD-CWH. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 4, 2015 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 11/4/2015. By Judicial Assistant: KAE for SRB. The Honorable Judge James C. Mahan is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRB)
November 4, 2015 Filing 6 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (TR)
November 4, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Prona Tools, Inc. and Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. re #1 Complaint. (TR)
November 4, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (TR)
November 4, 2015 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (TR)
November 4, 2015 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Responses due by 11/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven A. Caloiaro, #2 Declaration of Daniel Maier, #3 Exhibit to Declaration of Daniel Maier, #4 Proposed Order Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd., #5 Proposed Order Prona Tools, Inc.)(Caloiaro, Steven)
November 4, 2015 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven A. Caloiaro, #2 Declaration of Daniel Maier, #3 Exhibit to Daniel Maier Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd., #5 Proposed Order Prona Tools, Inc.)(Caloiaro, Steven)
November 4, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3879450), filed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/14/2015. Proof of service due by 3/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd., #3 Summons Prona Tools, Inc.) (Caloiaro, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Refine Wufu Air Tools Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jane W. Wise
Represented By: J. Kevin Fee
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Jordana Sara Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prona Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Chad Clement
Represented By: Yin Huang
Represented By: Alan Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Steven Anthony Caloiaro
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Emily Anne Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?