Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada et al v. Commercial Union Tile & Stone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworks Local 13 Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Crafttsworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Health Fund and Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Defendant: Jonathan William Canja, Commercial Union Tile & Stone, Inc., Jedediah Michael Feller, Stone Consulting, LLC and Vegas Affordable Stone and Tile, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv02129
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 115 Motion to Continue Judgment Debtor Exam of Jonathan William Canja to 9/19/2018 at 10:00 a.m. at The Urban Law Firm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 100 Motion to Dismiss Claims against Jonathan William Canja. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT Against Jonathan William Canja. Judgment is entered against Defendant Jonathan William Canja, an individual, in favor of the Plaintiff, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, in the amount of $15,190.27 for attorney's fees and costs incurred by the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that the clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Jonathan William Canja and against plaintiffs Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada; Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund; and Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund.A proposed joint pretrial order regarding the remaining disputes between plaintiffs Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund and the Inte rnational Masonry Institute and defendant Jonathan William Canjais is due 30 days from the date of this order.Plaintiff Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund shall file a proposed form of judgment on attorneys fees and costs against defendant Jonathan William Canja by 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants Commercial Union Tile & Stone, Inc. and Vegas Affordable Stone and Tile, Inc., joint and several, for a total of $377,263.74. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Trust ees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund and against defendant Jonathan William Canja in the amount of $41,224.51. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding these issues by 7/14/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Stone Consulting, LLC Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Jedediah Michael Feller. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Third Request) to File Responses to 53 , 54 , 55 , and 56 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/13/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) to File Responses to Pending 53 , 54 , 55 , and 56 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/13/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to File Responses to 53 , 54 , 55 , and 56 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/13/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs' 52 Motion for Calculation of Attorneys Fees is Granted. Payment of $2,320 shall be made to Plaintiffs' counsel by no later than 12/16/2016. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 42 Motion for Calculation of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Payment of $2,385 shall be made to Plaintiffs' counsel no later than 11/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 38 Stipulation to Continue without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 35 Motion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Plaintiffs shall file no later than 9/21/2016 appropriate paperwork as to the amount of attorneys' fees and costs they seek to recover. Any response shall be filed by 9/28/2016 and any reply shall be filed by 10/3/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Notice of Subpoena. The document was filed in violation of Local Rule 26-8 and it shall be STRICKEN by the Clerk. The Court ORDERS the parties and counsel to cease filing discovery documents on the docket as required by Local Rule 26-8. Failure to abide by this order and Local Rule 26-8 may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1, no later than 4:00 p.m., January 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada et al v. Commercial Union Tile & Stone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworks Local 13 Nevada
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Crafttsworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Health Fund
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan William Canja
Represented By: Antony M. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Union Tile & Stone, Inc.
Represented By: Antony M. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedediah Michael Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Antony M. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegas Affordable Stone and Tile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?