Jasminka Dubric v. A Cab LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Jasminka Dubric
Defendant: A Cab, LLC and Creighton J. Nady
Case Number: 2:2015cv02136
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINAL JUDGMENT granting ECF No. 112 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part ECF No. 96 Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Consistent with the foregoing analysis, Defendant A Cab is hereby awarded reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $49,492.38. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 04/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED that all meals for impaneled jury shall be paid by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Plaintiff's first ECF No. 46 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's second ECF No. 47 Motion in Limine; granting Plaintiff's third ECF No. 48 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' ECF No. 49 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying ECF No. 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. 32 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasminka Dubric v. A Cab LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Cab, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton J. Nady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasminka Dubric
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?