Unite Here Health v. Titolo et al
Plaintiff: Unite Here Health
Defendant: Imelda Agcaolil, Raymond Bodiford, Bodiford Law Group, Timothy R. Titolo, Chtd., Lisa Titolo, Timothy R. Titolo and Titolo Law Office
Case Number: 2:2015cv02160
Filed: November 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying without prejudice 38 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a STATUS REPORT by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER setting a hearing re 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for 2/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Timothy Titolo and a corporate representative for Timothy R. Titolo, Chtd shall appear at the hearin g in person, as well as their current counsel and any newly retained counsel. No later than January 25, 2018, Ms. Nakamura Ochoa shall serve Cross-Claimants with this order and shall file a proof of service. Any response to the motion to withdraw shall be filed no later than February 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties, or any one of them, must file a STATUS REPORT informing me of the status of Lisa's bankruptcy case no later than 4/18/2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to have the docket reflect that this case is STAYED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Unite Here Health in the amount of $28,202.53 in monetary damages on its claims against Lisa Titolo for conversion and unjust enrichment, with post- judgment interest accruing from the date of entry of the judgment at the rate of.86%, computed daily, until the judgment is paid in full. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that 25 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that the default judgment erroneously entered against Lisa in favor of the cross-claimants [ECF No. 22 ] is STRUCK. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter DEFAULT against Lisa in favor of crossclaimants Raymond Bodiford, Bodiford Law Group, Timothy Titolo, and Titolo Law Office. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Bodiford Law Group, Timothy R. Titolo, Chtd., Titolo Law Office, Raymond Bodiford, Timothy R. Titolo against Lisa Titolo. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 6/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 13 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a discovery plan that complies with the Local Rules no later than 4/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unite Here Health v. Titolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda Agcaolil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Bodiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodiford Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Titolo, Chtd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Titolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Titolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titolo Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unite Here Health
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?