Woodbury Law, Ltd. v. Bank of America National Association et al
Plaintiff: Woodbury Law, Ltd.
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America National Association, Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Andrew S. Lai, National Default Servicing Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and The Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-59 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-59
Case Number: 2:2015cv02247
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/21/2017.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or a status report on or before August 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that a Joint Status Report or a Stipulation to Dismiss due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or a Status Report on or before 3/17/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER for Status Report. Stipulation to Dismiss or Status Report due by 11/25/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 48 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting a hearing on the 36 Stipulation re Discovery Matters for 5/16/2016 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Andrew S. Laiby by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Defendant shall show cause, in writing, no later than 01/05/2016, why sanctions should not be imposed in a court fine of up to $500 for its failure to file a Certificate of Interested Parties and its failure to comply with this Court's 6 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Bank of America N.A. shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties by 12/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodbury Law, Ltd. v. Bank of America National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew S. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-59 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-59
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodbury Law, Ltd.
Represented By: Jordan B Peel
Represented By: Rodney S. Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?