Bailey v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: |
Viana B Bailey |
Defendant: |
William Oscar Harris, Robert David Neal and Ralph Taylor |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv02279 |
Filed: |
December 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 27, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER: Plaintiff Viana Bailey's objections 25 are OVERRULED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Viana Bailey's Third Demand for Final Judgment 27 is DENIED. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
23
ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge Foley's 22 Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED. All pending 10 and 11 Motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
22
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's 1 Complaint be Dismissed. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of the Court be instructed to close this case and enter judgment according. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
17
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties have until 2/10/17 to retain counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the requirements of the Local Rules of Practice or shall file a notice with the Court that he or she will be appearin g in this matter pro se. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court orders all parties to show cause in writing by 2/10/17 why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of an actual dispute and lack of prosecution. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions,which may include a recommendation to the District Judge that the complaint be dismissed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?