Jablonski Enterprises, LTD v. Nye County et al
Plaintiff: Jablonski Enterprises, LTD
Defendant: Clayton P. Brust, Greg Ekins, GIS Land Services, Brian Kunzi, Tom Lewis, Lithium Corporation, Nye County, Nevada, Debbie Orrick, Sheree Stringer, Summa, LLC, Henry Tonking and Marla Zlotek
Case Number: 2:2015cv02296
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 118 Notice re Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Mark G Simons terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 110 Greg Ekins and G.I.S. Land Services' Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees be granted, in part, and Plaintiff should pay the total sum of $2,287.50. Objections to R&R due by 11/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER that 76 Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court DENIES the request to relieve Plaintiff from the prior Order, (ECF No. 67 ). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Adopting in full 104 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that 69 Defendant Brust's Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall pay the total sum of $1,639.25 and is ordered to make the payment to Defendants by October 2, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's request for sanctions is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Defendants Lithium, Summa, and Tonking's Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the total sum of $2,016.00, and is ordered to make the payment to Defendants by October 2, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 75 Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees be granted, in part, and denied, in part. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 69 Defendant Brust's Motion for Attorney's Fees be granted, in part, and denied, in part. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 70 Defendant Lithium, Summa, and Tonking's Motion for Attorney's Fees be granted, in part, and denied, in part. Objections to R&R due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that 84 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 69 , 70 , 73 , and 75 Defendants' Motions for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Responses due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, (ECF Nos. 6 , 7 , 11 , 51 ), are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, (ECF No. 35 ), is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than May 20, 2016 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 05/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that 18 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 6 and 7 Motions to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jablonski Enterprises, LTD v. Nye County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton P. Brust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Ekins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIS Land Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kunzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithium Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Orrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheree Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Tonking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Zlotek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jablonski Enterprises, LTD
Represented By: Lisa A Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?