Michaud v. Williams, et al.,
Plaintiff: John Michaud
Defendant: Mr Adams, Mr Brooks, Mr Brown, Mr Carlman, Mr Dreesen, Mr Fowley, Mr Jeager, Mr Jopalian, Mr Lara, Mr Tate and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2015cv02324
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue/re-issue a summons under seal to Defendants Sarkis Jopalian, Ron Jaeger and Glenn Fowler at the last known addresses found in ECF Nos. 32 and 48. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provi de the U.S. Marshal's office with the Summons, a copy of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 4 ), a copy of the Attorney General's Submission of Last Known Addresses (ECF No. 32 and 48), and a copy of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send the required USM-285 forms to Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days to furnish the required USM-285 forms to the U.S. Marshal. FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal shall NOT provide Plaint iff with a copy of the completed USM-285 forms. Rather, the U.S. Marshal's office shall file the executed summon under seal to demonstrate that service has been completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 2/28/2018 to reflect correct signature date (MMM).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Re: 42 Notice to Correct Error. The Court finds good cause to grant Plaintiff's request. The Department of Corrections is to provide the Court with the last known addresses of Defendants Fowler and Brown under seal by 2/22/2018. The Department shall also inform the Court if it is unable to identify either of these Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons under seal to Defendants Sarkis Jopalian and Ron Jeager at the last known addresses found in ECF No. 32. The U.S. Marshal's office is directed to serve the summons and 4 First Amended C omplaint no later than 2/9/2018 and file the executed summons under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Summons, Amended Complaint, 32 , and Order hand delivered to USM - SLD) (Main Document 38 replaced on 1/31/2018) (SLD).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 34 Response to Defendant's Limited Opposition. Plaintiff's response does not alter the Court's prior ruling (see Order ECF No. 30). Plaintiff is again advised tofollow the proper procedure to use the funds maintained in his inmate account. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Plaintiff's 28 Supplement to Motion for Appointment of Counsel is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion for In Camera Submission. The Department of Corrections shall provide the Court,under seal, with the last known addresses of 1) Mr. Brooks; 2) Mr. Fowley; 3) Mr. Jopalian; and 4) Mr. Jeager no later than 1/26/2018. The Department shall also inform the Court if it is unable to identify any of these Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In the event that this action is dismissed the full filing fee must still be paid. Service must be perfected within 90 days from the date of this order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff re whom it does/does not accept service for. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance; Attorney General copy of this Order and 4 ; mailed Order to NDOC and Plaintiff - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaud v. Williams, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Carlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Fowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Jeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Jopalian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?