Federal National Mortgage Association v. Willis et al
Defendant: Ernest C. Aldridge, Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC, Jorge M. Luna, Irena Damianova, Thomas E. Willis, Clarence Moses Willis and Geri L. McKinnon
Counter Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv02366
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MEMORANDUM to #369 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B)(Garabedian, Jory)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER Granting #368 Motion to Deem Defendants Clarence Moses Willis and Ernest C. Aldridge Vexatious Litigants. See Order for Details. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Order to Show Cause & Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2023 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Crtrm Administrator: AB; Pla Counsel: Jory Garabedian; Def Counsel: Ernest Aldridge, Pro Se & Clarence Willis, Pro Se; Court Reporter: Kathy French; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 5.The Court explains the purpose of today's hearing and provides background information regarding Case Numbers 2:15-cv-02366-MMD-EJY and 3:23-cv-00379-MMD-EJY. In addition to the Motion to Deem Defendants Vexatious (ECF No. #368 ) and Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #369 ), the Court has reviewed the Counterclaim (ECF No. #375 ) and the Lost Mail Certificate of Service (ECF No. #376 ).Mr. Willis advises the Court of when he received the Plaintiff's Motions (ECF Nos. #368 , #369 ) and the Court's Minute Order filed 9/1/2023 (ECF No. 374 ) in Case Number 2:15-cv-02366-MMD-EJY. Mr. Willis further advises the reason for the delay in filing the responses to the Plaintiff's Motions. Mr. Willis responds to the Court's inquiries. The Court accepts the responses to the Motions. The Court is provided with and reviews the electronic copies of the Response to Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #377 ), Affidavit in Support of the ECF No. 377 Response (ECF No. #378 ), Response to the ECF No. 374 Minute Order (ECF No. #379 ), and Response to the Motion to Deem Defendants Vexatious Litigants (ECF No. #380 ) which were filed on the docket during this proceeding. Mr. Willis, Mr. Aldridge, and Mr. Garabedian present arguments to the Court. The Court recites findings as to Case Number 2:15-cv-002366-MMD-EJY. The Court will grant the Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #369 ) and Motion to Deem Defendants Clarence Moses Willis and Ernest C. Aldridge Vexatious Litigants (ECF No. #368 ). The Court finds Mr. Willis and Mr. Aldridge in contempt of the Court's prior orders. The Court agrees that sanctions for contempt should be imposed. The Court will grant reasonable fees incurred in connection to the Motion for Order to Show Cause and any work related to that Motion, including attending today's hearing. A written order will issue. The Court recites findings as to Case Number 3:23-cv-00379-MMD-EJY. The Motion to Stay Case (ECF No. 17) and Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default (ECF No. 26) are denied as moot. The Court agrees that sanctions for contempt should be imposed. The Court will grant reasonable fees incurred defending this case. The Court will sua sponte dismiss this case that was filed in clear contempt of the Court in Case Number 2:15-cv-002366-MMD-EJY. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae") in Case Number 3:23-cv-00379-MMD-EJY. The action is dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case.IT IS ORDERED that Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae") will file the Affidavit for Fees on or before seven (7) days from today's date. Thereafter, Mr. Willis and Mr. Aldridge shall have thirty (30) days to respond. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 376 LOST MAIL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Opposition to Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (CT)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 380 RESPONSE to #368 Motion to Deem Defendants Clarence Moses Willis and Ernest C. Aldridge Vexatious Litigants, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Replies due by 9/25/2023. (JQC)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE to 374 Minute Order by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (JQC)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 378 AFFIDAVIT of in Support of #377 Response by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (JQC)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 377 RESPONSE to #369 Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis and Ernest C. Aldridge. Replies due by 9/25/2023. (JQC)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 375 COUNTERCLAIM against Federal National Mortgage Association by Ernest C. Aldridge. (JQC)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/1/2023. The Court grants Fannie Mae's motion for an order to show cause (ECF No. #369 ("Motion")) as unopposed because Willis and Aldridge did not file a response to it by the deadline set in the Court's prior minute order setting an expedited briefing schedule (ECF No. 370 ). See LR 7-2(d). It is therefore ordered that Willis and Aldridge must show cause at the in-person hearing the Court already set (ECF No. 372 ) why they should not be held in further contempt of Court for the conduct described in Fannie Mae's Motion. It is further ordered that all parties must be prepared to address the issue of appropriate sanctions if the Court finds Willis and Aldridge in further contempt of Court at the hearing. It is further ordered that all parties must also be prepared to address Fannie Mae's motion to deem Willis and Aldridge vexatious litigants (ECF No. #368 ) at the in-person hearing on September 19, 2023 as well. If Willis and Aldridge would like to file a written response to either the Motion or the motion to deem them vexatious litigants (ECF No. #368 ), they must do so by September 12, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Willis and Aldridge by U.S. Mail and Certified mail. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TH)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephanie A. Garabedian on behalf of Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Garabedian, Stephanie)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. An in-person hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause is set for 9/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Defendants are required to appear at this hearing. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this notice of hearing to Defendants by US Mail and Certified mail. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 371 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #369 Motion for Order to Show Cause, 370 Minute Order,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association.. (Garabedian, Jory)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2023. Before the Court is Fannie Mae's emergency motion for an order to show cause why Willis and Aldridge should not be held in contempt of Court. (ECF No. #369 ("Motion").) The Court will not address the Motion on an emergency basis because Fannie Mae did not comply with LR 7-4. However, the Court will nonetheless set an expedited briefing schedule on the Motion because the Court is familiar with the procedural history of this case. Any response is due by Friday, August 25, 2023. Any reply is due by Tuesday, August 29, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TH)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause re #368 Motion, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 9/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Garabedian, Jory) (nondispositive)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION to Deem Defendants Clarence Moses Willis and Ernest C. Aldridge Vexatious Litigants by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 9/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garabedian, Jory) (misc) (nondispositive)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:23-cv-00379-MMD-CLB by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. . (Garabedian, Jory)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE from Lyon County Recorder : Order (ECF No. #365 ) recorded as DOC # 664020. (DRM)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 AMENDED ORDER ORDERED that the Homeria Case, Case No. 2:21-cv-01816-MMD-EJY, is alternatively barred by the doctrines of claim and issue preclusion. Fannie Mae's pending motion to dismiss that case (ECF No. 10 ) is granted. The other pending motions (ECF Nos. #9 , #13 , #16 ) are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Fannie Mae's favor in the Homeria Case in accordance with this order and keep it closed. It is further ordered that the Canadian Case, Case No. 2:21-cv-01913-MMD-EJY, is alternatively barred by the doctrines of claim and issue preclusion. Fannie Mae's pending motion to dismiss the amended complaint in that case (ECF No. #13 ) is granted. The other pending motions (ECF Nos. #5 , 10 , #12 , 17 ) are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Fannie Mae's favor in the Canadian Case in accordance with this order and keep it closed. It is further ordered that the Garden Case, Case No. 3:21-cv-00485-MMD-EJY, is alternatively barred by the doctrines of claim and issue preclusion. Fannie Mae's pending motion to dismiss that case (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Fannie Mae's favor in the Garden Case in accordance with this order and keep it closed. It is further ordered that Willis and Aldridge are, and remain, in contempt of Court. It is further ordered that Fannie Mae's motion for an order to show cause in this case (ECF No. #304 ) is granted as specified herein. It is further ordered that Willis' motion to remand in this case (ECF No. #315 ) is denied. It is further ordered that the following recorded documents regarding 330 Garden Lane, Fernley, Nevada are void ab into and are hereby expunged: Quit Claim Deed, recorded on December 21, 2020, as Document No. 627159; Grant Deed, recorded on March 18, 2021, as Document No. 633158; and Grant Deed, recorded on October 12, 2021, as Document No. 645910 . It is further ordered that Willis and Aldridge must show cause why the Court should not issue a warrant for their arrest as an escalating sanction for their continued contempt of Court at an in person hearing on Thursday, May 19, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of the Bruce. R. Thompson Federal Courthouse located at 400 S. Virginia St. Reno, NV 89501. (ECF No. 318 .) It is further ordered that, if Willis or Aldridge do not appear at the show cause hearing mentioned above, the Court will immediately issue a warrant for their arrest. It is further ordered that Willis and Aldridge must do the following between the date of entry of this order and the show cause hearing: (See pdf order for detailed specific actions.) It is further ordered that if Willis and Aldridge complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing, Fannie Mae must file a written notice with the Court asking that the show cause hearing be vacated. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing, the Court may have them arrested at the conclusion of the show cause hearing. Upon arrest, the Court will then imprison them only until they complete the tasks enumerated herein. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may subsequently permit Fannie Mae to enter onto any of the Judgment Properties, secure them, and remove any persons, personal property, and for-sale/for-lease signage in accordance with this order. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may order that Willis and Aldridge are jointly and severally liable for all of Fannie Mae's attorneys' fees and costs incurred in litigating any and all issues related to the Judgment Properties that post-date the Judgment and are not part of the direct appeal of the Judgment. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may order that Willis and Aldridge are jointly and severally liable for all of Fannie Maes costs it incurs to take possession of the Judgment Properties or remove any persons or personal property from them, if necessary and upon Fannie Maes request. Clerk's note: Attached document corrects the document attached to ECF No. Re: 341 and corrects a typographical error; the docketing is copied from the docket entry for ECF No. 341 ) with the corrected document in bold. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/4/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Order (ECF No. #320 ) to Show Cause contains a typographical error on page 12, line 27. For that reason, and that reason only, an amended order will be filed. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 RESPONSE/Opposition to ECF No. #361 Proposed Order Submission by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (HKL)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITH EVICTION RE: THE HOMERIA PROPERTY (re ECF No. #361 Proposed Order Submission). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association.. (Miller, Christina)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 STATUS REPORT Regarding Eviction Proceeding Against the Homeria Property by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Christina)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE of Compliance by Federal National Mortgage Association re #357 Order on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens,,,,,,,.. (Miller, Christina)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 10/28/2022 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Christina Miller; Def Counsel: Ernest Aldridge, pro se, Clarence Willis, pro se; Court Reporter: Donna Prather; Time of Hearing: 10:00 - 10:15 AM; Courtroom: 5. Ms. Miller advises the Court that as of the date of the status report (ECF No. #355 , filed 10/26/2022), the Homeria property was still occupied. Mr. Aldridge addresses the Court. The Court informs Mr. Aldridge that it is enforcing the orders issued by prior judges and that all jurisdictional issues have been resolved. The Court will direct its staff to print out prior orders if Mr. Aldridge requires them. The Court asks Mr. Aldridge why he has not complied with the Order the Court issued verbally (see ECF No. 350 ) to notify the tenant to vacate the Homeria Property. For the reasons the Court places on the record, the Court will grant Plaintiff leave to proceed with proceedings to evict the tenant at the Homeria property. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a status report within 14 days that advises the progress of eviction proceedings against the current tenant of the Homeria property. The Court makes additional findings for the record that Defendants remain in contempt of court for failing to comply with the Court's order (ECF No. 350 ) to notify the tenant at the Homeria property to vacate the property. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a proposed order consistent with the Court's ruling today. The Court will award reasonable costs and attorney fees to Plaintiff and directs Plaintiff to file an affidavit of fees. The Court will set a deadline for Defendants to respond to the request for fees and costs. Ms. Miller asks if Plaintiff can obtain the current tenant's name. Mr. Aldridge initially objects but discloses the tenant's name in open court. Mr. Aldridge asks the Court to issue a written order today. The minutes and transcript of today's proceeding reflect the order of the Court. The Court will provide copies of prior orders to Mr. Aldridge. The Court thanks the United States Marshal Service for attending the proceedings today. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Granting #354 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. It is further ordered that the applicable notices of lis pendens (ECF Nos. #354 -1, #354 -2) are cancelled. See NRS 14.015(5). This order has the same effect as expungement of the original notice. See id. It is further ordered that Fannie Mae must record a copy of this order with the applicable county recorder for both the Garden Property and the Homeria Property.It is further ordered that Fannie Mae must file a written notice of compliance with this Court after it has recorded a copy of this order with the applicable county recorder for both the Garden Property and the Homeria Property. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE of Compliance by Federal National Mortgage Association re 350 Order on Motion for Recusal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Show Cause Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. (Miller, Christina)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 STATUS REPORT Regarding Occupancy of the Homeria Property by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association.. (Miller, Christina)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Miller, Christina)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RESPONSE to #352 Response by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Miller, Christina)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 RESPONSE/Filing to Show Cause Why Defendant Aldridge is Not in Contempt of This Court re ECF No. 350 Minutes of Proceedings, Show Cause Hearing, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (CJS)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 350 Order on Motion for Recusal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Show Cause Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, held on 9-26-22, before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, KF@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 11/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 11/11/2022. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 1/9/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KF)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 9/26/2022 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Christina Miller; Def Counsel: Ernest Aldridge, pro se, Clarence Willis, pro se; Court Reporter: Kathy French; Time of Hearing: 10:02 AM - 10:51 AM; Courtroom: 5. The Court makes findings for the record with regard to Defendant Aldridge's motion for recusal (ECF No. #347 .) For the reasons the Court has placed on the record, Defendant Aldridge's motion (ECF No. #347 ) is denied. The Court addresses the parties regarding the reason for this hearing and recites the history of prior orders by Judge Mahan (ECF No. 294 ), and the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. The Court finds that the only issues remaining to be addressed concerns enforcement of Judge Mahan's order (ECF No. 294 ) with regard to ensuring that Defendants vacate and turn over the three subject properties (the Garden Lane property in Fernley, NV, the Canadian Drive and Homeria properties in Clark County, NV). Ms. Miller advises the Court of the items 1 and 4 required in the Court's order (ECF No. #320 ) have been satisfied. She advises that a tenant resides in the Homeria property and that the other properties are vacant. The Garden Lane property's quit claim deeds filed in 2021 onwards that were expunged by the Court's order (item 3 in ECF No. #320 ) have not been expunged. The Court directs Plaintiff to record the judgment (filed as ECF No. 24 in 2:21-cv-1913 at the direction of the Court in ECF No. #320 ) to clear the record for the Garden Lane property and file a notice that it has done so. Item 5 of the Court's order (ECF No. #320 ) remains outstanding. Mr. Aldridge addresses the Court with regard to the Homeria and Garden Lane properties. The Court reiterates the purpose of the hearing and that prior orders in this case indicate that the properties are owned by Plaintiff. It is ordered: Defendant Ernest Aldridge is to notify the tenants at the Homeria property to vacate the property within 30 days of this date so that Plaintiff can take possession of the property. It is further ordered that Plaintiff is to file a status report by 10/26/2022, indicating whether the property on Homeria is vacant. The Court inquires why Mr. Aldridge and Mr. Willis have not signed the document addressed as item 5 in the Court's order (ECF No. #320 ). Mr. Aldridge asks the Court to take judicial notice of Nevada Revised Statutes. The Court declines to take judicial notice and reiterates the purposes of this hearing. Mr. Aldridge and Mr. Willis address the Court. The Court will not require the defendants to sign the document. The Court does advise them that Plaintiff owns the properties at issue, regardless of how they feel about the process, and that any and all communications with Plaintiff is to go through the law firm that represents Plaintiff. The Court finds the Defendants remain in contempt of court with regard to the Homeria property. Mr. Willis addresses the Court regarding Judge Mahan's prior contempt order. The Court will not revisit the issue and points to its order (ECF No. #320 .) The Court defers sanctioning Defendants, giving Mr. Aldridge 30 days to comply with the order to have tenants vacate the Homeria property and to turn over the property to Plaintiff. The Show Cause Hearing is continued to for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. If Plaintiff's status report, due 10/26/2022, indicate that the property is vacated by Mr. Aldridge's tenant, the Court will vacate the 10/28/2022 hearing. The Court admonishes Defendants that this is their final warning. The Court will consider taking additional sanctions, including taking Defendant Aldridge into custody. The Court notes that a Deputy US Marshal has been in the courtroom throughout this hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 RESPONSE Show Cause Statement re ECF No. 341 Order, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge (unsigned). (DRM)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 RESPONSE to ECF No. 341 Order, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(DRM)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MOTION for Recusal of Judge, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (presiding) Responses due by 10/5/2022. (DRM)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 PROOF OF SERVICE - Certified Mail for Ernest C. Aldridge re ECF No. 341 Minute Order. (HKL)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case, Lift Stay and Reset Show Cause Hearing (re ECF Nos. #337 Motion to Reopen Case, #338 Motion to Lift Stay, #339 Motion) by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (HKL)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, DISMISSED as to #340 USCA Order re #323 Notice of Appeal filed by Ernest C. Aldridge (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 PROOF OF SERVICE - Certified Mail for Clarence Moses Willis re ECF No. 341 Minute Order. (CJS)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/30/2022. The Court of Appeals has dismissed the parties' appeal (ECF No. #340 .) Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's motion to reopen case (ECF No. #337 ), motion to lift stay of case (ECF No. #338 ) and motion to reset the show cause hearing (ECF No. #339 ) are granted. It is ordered that Defendants Clarence Willis and Ernest Aldridge must show cause why the Court should not issue a warrant for their arrest as an escalating sanction for their continued contempt of Court at an in person hearing on Monday, September 26, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of the Bruce R. Thompson Federal Courthouse located at 400 S. Virginia St. Reno, NV 89501. It is further ordered that, if Willis or Aldridge do not appear at the show cause hearing mentioned above, the Court will immediately issue a warrant for their arrest.It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated in the Court's prior order (ECF No. #320 ,) between now and the show cause hearing, the Court may have them arrested at the conclusion of the show cause hearing. Upon arrest, the Court will then imprison them only until they complete the tasks enumerated in the Court's order (ECF No. #320 .)It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may subsequently permit Fannie Mae to enter onto any of the Judgment Properties, secure them, and remove any persons, personal property, and for-sale/for-lease signage in accordance with this order.It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated in the Court's order (ECF No. #320 between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may order that Willis and Aldridge are jointly and severally liable for all of Fannie Mae's attorneys' fees and costs incurred in litigating any and all issues related to the Judgment Properties that post-date the Judgment and are not part of the direct appeal of the Judgment.It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated in the order (ECF No. #320 ) between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may order that Willis and Aldridge are jointly and severally liable for all of Fannie Mae/s costs it incurs to take possession of the Judgment Properties or remove any persons or personal property from them, if necessary and upon Fannie Mae's request.The Clerk of Court is directed to mail copies of this order to pro se Defendants Aldridge and Willis by certified mail with return receipt requested. (Certified Mail Receipt #7019 0140 0000 9995 1553 to D Willis. Certified Mail Receipt #7019 0140 0000 9995 1560 to D Aldridge.) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) Modified on 8/30/2022 (CJD).
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MOTION to Reset Show Cause Hearing by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 9/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Christina) (misc) (nondispositive)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION to Lift Stay of Case by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 9/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Christina)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION to Reopen Case by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 9/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Christina)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #323 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ernest C. Aldridge. USCA Case Number 22-15562. Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and dismiss this appeal as frivolous, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2). All other pending motions are denied as moot. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. DISMISSED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 RESPONSE to #324 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Miller, Christina)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 RESPONSE/Opposition to ECF No. #333 Emergency Motion for Clarification, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Replies due by 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20) (DRM)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER - Fannie Mae's emergency motion for clarification of the stay order (ECF No. #333 ) is granted. The Court's stay order (ECF No. #330 ) regarding its contempt order (ECF No. #320 ) in no way affects the validity of the Judgment Fannie Mae previously obtained in this case. In pertinent part, the Judgment specifies that Fannie Mae owns the property commonly known as 4912 Canadian Drive, Las Vegas, Nevada 89130. (ECF No. #264 at 2.) Any representation to the contrary (see ECF No. #333 at 5-6) is incorrect. The Judgment in this case remains in full force and effect. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order, along with another copy of the Judgment (ECF No. #264 ), to pro se Defendants Aldridge and Willis by certified mail with return receipt requested (mailed 5/17/2022). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Emergency MOTION for Clarification of the Stay Order re #330 Order on Motion for Recusal,,,,, Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel,,,,, Order Staying Case,,,,, Terminate Case,,,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 5/30/2022. (Miller, Christina)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. 325 Order, mailed on 4/21/2022 addressed to Ernest C. Aldridge. (DRM)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge - Certified Mail Return Receipt received as to ECF No. #330 Order. (CJD)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDERED that the hearing currently set for May 19, 2022 (ECF Nos. 318 , #320 ) is vacated. It is further ordered that this case is stayed in its entirety pending the outcome of Aldridge's appeal. It is further ordered that the Court will lift the stay upon resolution of Aldridge's appeal and may reset the previously-set hearing. It is further ordered that Aldridge's recusal motion (ECF No. #327 ) is denied as moot, without prejudice to refiling once the Court later lifts the stay in this case. It is further ordered that Willis' motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #328 ) is denied as moot, without prejudice to refiling once the Court later lifts the stay in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to note that this case is now stayed and to administratively close it. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail copies of this order to pro se Defendants Aldridge and Willis by certified mail with return receipt requested. Cert. Mail Nos. 7019 0140 0000 9995 1447, and 7019 0140 0000 9995 1454, respectively. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel "For Defendant Clarence Moses Willis Re: Criminal Contempt - Jury Trial Requested" re ECF No. #320 Order, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (CJD)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Submission for the record Motion and Demand for Recusal of District Judge Miranda M. Du by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (HKL)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/21/2022. Before the Court is Defendant Clarence Moses Willis' motion to strike. (ECF No. #322 .) The Court addressed and rejected the same argument Willis raises in his motion to strike in its recent order (ECF No. #320 at 9) and accordingly denies Willis' motion to strike (ECF No. #322 ) for the same reasons it provided in its order (ECF No. #320 at 9). The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order to Willis and Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge by certified mail, return receipt requested. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TH)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule and letter as to #323 Notice of Appeal filed by Ernest C. Aldridge. USCA Case Number 22-15562. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.) (CJD)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to ECF No. #320 Order, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Filing Fee not paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Copy of PACER docket sheet sent to Ernest Aldridge for 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 USCA Representation Statement, #2 ECF No. 320 Order) (CJD)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MOTION to Strike Unserved ECF No. #285 Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (Oral Argument Requested) Responses due by 4/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (CJD)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDERED that the Homeria Case, Case No. 2:21-cv-01816-MMD-EJY, is alternatively barred by the doctrines of claim and issue preclusion. Fannie Mae's pending motion to dismiss that case (ECF No. 10) is granted. The other pending motions (ECF Nos. 9, 13, 16) are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Fannie Mae's favor in the Homeria Case in accordance with this order and keep it closed. It is further ordered that the Canadian Case, Case No. 2:21-cv-01913-MMD-EJY, is alternatively barred by the doctrines of claim and issue preclusion. Fannie Mae's pending motion to dismiss the amended complaint in that case (ECF No. 13) is granted. The other pending motions (ECF Nos. 5, 10, 12, 17) are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Fannie Mae's favor in the Canadian Case in accordance with this order and keep it closed. It is further ordered that the Garden Case, Case No. 3:21-cv-00485-MMD-EJY, is alternatively barred by the doctrines of claim and issue preclusion. Fannie Mae's pending motion to dismiss that case (ECF No. 5) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Fannie Mae's favor in the Garden Case in accordance with this order and keep it closed. It is further ordered that Willis and Aldridge are, and remain, in contempt of Court. It is further ordered that Fannie Mae's motion for an order to show cause in this case (ECF No. #304 ) is granted as specified herein. It is further ordered that Willis' motion to remand in this case (ECF No. #315 ) is denied. It is further ordered that the following recorded documents regarding 330 Garden Lane, Fernley, Nevada are void ab into and are hereby expunged: Quit Claim Deed, recorded on December 21, 2020, as Document No. 627159; Grant Deed, recorded on March 18, 2021, as Document No. 633158; and Grant Deed, recorded on October 12, 2021, as Document No. 645190. It is further ordered that Willis and Aldridge must show cause why the Court should not issue a warrant for their arrest as an escalating sanction for their continued contempt of Court at an in person hearing on Thursday, May 19, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of the Bruce. R. Thompson Federal Courthouse located at 400 S. Virginia St. Reno, NV 89501. (ECF No. 318.) It is further ordered that, if Willis or Aldridge do not appear at the show cause hearing mentioned above, the Court will immediately issue a warrant for their arrest. It is further ordered that Willis and Aldridge must do the following between the date of entry of this order and the show cause hearing: (See pdf order for detailed specific actions.) It is further ordered that if Willis and Aldridge complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing, Fannie Mae must file a written notice with the Court asking that the show cause hearing be vacated. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing, the Court may have them arrested at the conclusion of the show cause hearing. Upon arrest, the Court will then imprison them only until they complete the tasks enumerated herein. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may subsequently permit Fannie Mae to enter onto any of the Judgment Properties, secure them, and remove any persons, personal property, and for-sale/for-lease signage in accordance with this order. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may order that Willis and Aldridge are jointly and severally liable for all of Fannie Maes attorneys' fees and costs incurred in litigating any and all issues related to the Judgment Properties that post-date the Judgment and are not part of the direct appeal of the Judgment. It is further ordered that, if Willis and Aldridge do not complete all of the tasks enumerated above between now and the show cause hearing or fail to appear for the show cause hearing, the Court may order that Willis and Aldridge are jointly and severally liable for all of Fannie Maes costs it incurs to take possession of the Judgment Properties or remove any persons or personal property from them, if necessary and upon Fannie Maes request. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail copies of this order to pro se Defendants Aldridge and Willis by certified mail with return receipt requested. (Cert Mail, 3/15/2022; Return Receipt Nos. : Ernest Aldridge, 7019 0140 0000 9995 1430; Clarence Willis, 7019 0140 0000 9995 1423.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 RESPONSE to #315 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 3/21/2022. (Miller, Christina)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Ashlyn Bye.An in-person hearing regarding the pending motions in this consolidated matter is set for Thursday, May 19, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. The Clerk's Office is directed to send a copy of this minute order to the pro se defendants by certified mail with return receipt requested. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE re 5373 Homeria, Las Vegas - Case No. (8th Judicial District Court), A-19-807464-A by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (HKL)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE re 330 Garden Lane Property - Case No. is 19CV362 in the Justice Court-Canal Township, Lyon County, Nevada, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (DRM)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Notice of Non-Consent to Removal to Federal Court, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (DRM)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Irena Damianova, and as to Jorge M. Luna re ECF No. #313 Proposed Summons to issue. (DRM)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge as to Irena Damianova, and Jorge M. Luna. (Attachments: #1 as to Jorge M. Luna) (DRM)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER - It is hereby ordered that Case Nos. 2:21-cv-01816-JAD-DJA, 2:21-cv-01913-GMN-DJA, and 3:21-cv-00485-MMD-CLB (collectively, Member Cases) are reassigned to Chief District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah, and then consolidated into Case No. 2:15-cv-02366-MMD-EJY (Lead Case). All future filings will be filed in the Lead Case. The pending motions to consolidate in the Member Cases are denied as moot. The Court directs that the Clerk of Court close the three Member Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du, Judge Gloria M. Navarro, and Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-02366-MMD-EJY. (no image attached) (AF)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 CLERK'S NOTICE Due to the retirement of the Honorable George Foley, Jr. this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-02366-MMD-NJK. (no image attached) (LE) Modified on 2/3/2022 (AF).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-02366-MMD-GWF. (no image attached) (LE)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/2/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Lia Griffin. Due to a clerical error and with good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 REPLY to Response to #304 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Christina)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE to ECF No. #304 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Replies due by 11/22/2021. (DRM)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE to #304 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (JQC)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re #264 Judgment, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Miller, Christina)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Miller, Christina)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE in Eighth Judicial District Court : A-21-837376-C, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (DRM)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-02366-LRH-GWF. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/2021. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. In light of the fact that the property in dispute is located in Fernley, Nevada, it is ORDERED this case be reassigned to a Reno judge. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 294 Show Cause Hearing,, held on 03/19/2021, before Judge James C. Mahan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samantha McNett, Samantha_McNett@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: 11:38 a.m. - 11:45 a.m.. Any Redaction Request is due by 4/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 4/24/2021. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 6/22/2021. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (SNM)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #288 NOTICE of Related/Associated Cases by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (JQC) Modified on 3/24/2021 (JQC).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Change of Address by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Address updated to c/o 2459 Christian Ave, Redding, CA 96002. (JQC) (Main Document 297 replaced on 3/24/2021) (JQC).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #295 Proposed Order Submission by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Sassi, Anthony)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 VIEW #296 corrected image re Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #285 Motion for Order to Show Cause, 294 Show Cause Hearing,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony) Modified on 3/22/2021 (DKJ).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing re: Plaintiff's #285 Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause held on 3/19/2021 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: NEV; Pla Counsel: Anthony Sassi, Esq.; Court Reporter: Samantha McNett; Recording start and end times: 11:38 a.m. - 11:45 a.m.; Courtroom: 6A. Defendants are not present. The Court canvasses and hears representations from Plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file the appropriate documents with the court. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 RESPONSE to #285 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (HAM)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #287 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #287 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #287 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #287 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Related/Associated Cases by Clarence Moses Willis. (HAM)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #285 Motion for Order to Show Cause. SHOW CAUSE Hearing set for 3/19/2021 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Fannie Mae must serve a copy of this show-cause order on Willis and Aldridge and file proof of service as soon as practicable. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/11/2021.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #285 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(d). An index of exhibits was not provided.Attorney Anthony Sassi is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Declaration) (Sassi, Anthony)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER on Mandate as to #280 Mandate re #276 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER on Mandate as to #279 Mandate, re #266 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #278 USCA Memorandum 18-15848. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #278 USCA Memorandum 18-16637. AFFIRMED (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM of USCA, Ninth Circuit, AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to #266 , #276 Notices of Appeal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #276 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ernest C. Aldridge, Clarence Moses Willis. USCA Case Number 18-16637. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #275 Order on Motion to Vacate,, by Defendants Ernest C. Aldridge, Clarence Moses Willis. Filing fee $ 505. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Receipt NVLAS058378, #2 Amended Notice) (JM)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER that #265 and #267 Aldridge's Motions are DENIED. No further motions will be considered in this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00 receipt number NVLAS057158 re #266 Notice of Appeal. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REPLY to Response to #265 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b) by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 "Purposed" judgment) (MMM)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESPONSE to #267 Motion by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 5/22/2018. (Sassi, Anthony)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 RESPONSE to #265 Motion to Vacate by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 5/21/2018. (Sassi, Anthony)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #266 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. To appeal the district court's ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #266 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. USCA Case Number 18-15848. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #266 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (TR)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION for Stay of Execution of Final Judgment Pending Appeal by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 5/23/2018. (MMM)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #264 Judgment, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Filing fee $ 505 (NOT paid). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION for Relief from Final Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b) re #264 Final Judgment, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Federal National Mortgage Association against Clarence Moses Willis for punitive damages in the amount of $103,300 for violation of 12 U.S.C. 1723a(e). (See Judgment for details). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 5/7/2018. (MMM)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY to Response to #255 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REPLY to Response to #253 Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to #253 Motion for Default Judgment; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Replies due by 4/4/2018. (MMM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REPLY to Response to #249 Motion to Clerk for Enforcement of Creditor Process Pursuant to FRCP 65.1 by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 RESPONSE to #255 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 4/2/2018. (Handley, Laurel)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESPONSE to #249 Motion to Enforce by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 3/23/2018. (Sassi, Anthony)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/14/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #255 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to LR 41-1., Want of Prosecution and FRCP 41(b). Failure to Comply with These Rule or a Court Order by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 3/26/2018. (MMM)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE: PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT re #253 Motion for Judgment by Federal National Mortgage Association . (Sassi, Anthony)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION for Default Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Sassi, Anthony) Modified event on 3/12/2018 (TR).
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 3/6/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy Hensel. Re: #245 Order The Order instructing the parties to file a joint proposed pretrial order was entered in error. The Court reviewed Plaintiff's Status Report (ECF No. 248) and the parties do not need to file a joint proposed pretrial order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IH)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE to the Court of Plaintiffs: Want of Prosecution Pursuant to LR 41-1., Failure to Comply with a Court Order Pursuant to FRCP 41(b) by Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 REPLY to #248 Status Report by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION to Clerk for Enforcement of Creditor Process Pursuant to FRCP 65.1, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 3/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tort) (MMM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge terminated pursuant to #247 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Unadjudicated Claims Alleged Against Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STATUS REPORT in Response to Order by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 RESPONSE to #245 Order, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 2/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Ex Parte Personal, Case Related Correspondence by Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER that #234 Motion for Recusal of District Judge is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER that #212 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/8/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 10/30/2017. (Sassi, Anthony)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER that #229 Defendant Aldrige's Motion for an Order Setting an Evidentiary Hearing on the Court's Jurisdiction is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that #232 Defendant Aldrige's First Amended Motion for an Order Setting an Evidentiary Hearing on the Court's Jurisdiction is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 REPLY to Response to #232 Motion for an Order Setting an Evidentiary Hearing on the Court's Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Submission for the Record of Transcript of 173 Motion Hearing held 3/3/2017, filed by Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATED NON-MONETARY JUDGMENT in favor of Federal National Mortgage Association against Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC re #235 Stipulation for Non-Monetary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 RESPONSE to #232 Motion for Hearing, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 8/11/2017. (Sassi, Anthony)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 STIPULATION for Non-Monetary Judgment by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION to Recuse Judge James C. Mahan by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 7/27/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy Hensel. RE: #232 Motion for Hearing Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendant's Amended Motion for Hearing (ECF No. 232) no later than August 4, 2017. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IH)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 FIRST AMENDED MOTION for an Order Setting an Evidentiary Hearing on the Court's Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER that #220 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #228 Motion for Recusal of District Judge is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 REPLY to Response to #220 Motion to Set Aside #210 Clerk's Entry of Default, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for an Order Setting an Evidentiary Hearing on the Court's Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REPLY to Response to #212 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE: of Non Compliance with LR IC 2-2(c) and Attorney Action Required to #224 Status Report. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Anthony Sassi CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document #224 , using the correct Reply to Response to Motion event and properly link newly filed Reply to #212 Motion, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached)(TR)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MOTION to Recuse District Judge James C. Mahan by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MMM)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REPLY to #216 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (ADR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event and properly establish docket entry relationship. Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony) Modified on 7/7/2017 (TR).
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 RESPONSE to #220 Motion to Set Aside, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 7/5/2017. (Sassi, Anthony)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER that #216 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 RESPONSE to #212 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Replies due by 6/30/2017. (MMM)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER re #208 Proposed Order for Default Judgment. Plaintiff is instructed to file a motion for default judgment in accordance with the applicable local and federal rules. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 RESPONSE to #216 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 6/29/2017. (Sassi, Anthony)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION to Set Aside #210 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 6/28/2017. (MMM)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #216 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 6/15/2017. (MMM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Federal National Mortgage Association against Geri L. McKinnon. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting #211 STIPULATION and Order for Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #212 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 6/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sassi, Anthony)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION and Order for Judgment by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Clarence Moses Willis. (AF)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE to #197 Joinder, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER for Default Judgment re #202 Order, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony) Modified on 5/17/2017 (AF).
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SUBPOENAS Issued to Ernest Aldridge per #206 Praecipe. (MMM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER Entry of Clerk's Default re #202 Order, and 204 Notice: Attorney Action Required; filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association . (Sassi, Anthony) Modified on 5/17/2017 (AF).
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PRAECIPE with Submission for the Record, filed by Ernest C. Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 proposed Subpoenas, #2 Exhibits - Modified to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1)(MMM)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of Non Compliance with LR 7-2 and Attorney Action Required: to #203 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. ERROR: After a review of document #203 , the Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default is missing. Pursuant to LR 7-2(a): All motions - unless made during a hearing or trial - must be in writing and served on all other parties who have appeared . CORRECTION: Attorney Anthony Sassi is advised to file a properly formatted Motion for Entry of Clerks Default pursuant to LR 7-2(a), using the Notice of Corrected Image event and properly link to #203 . (no image attached)(TR)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default of Clarence Moses Willis by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER that #190 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that #39 defendant Willis's Answer is STRICKEN. FURTHER ORDERED that #160 Motion for Sanctions against Willis is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and shall file, within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order, a proposed order for clerks entry of default and for default judgment consistent with the foregoing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 RESPONSE to Objection to #190 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #196 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) of Trial Deadlines (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 PROPOSED SUBPOENA to be issued, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (JM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (JM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 JOINDER of Party Federal Housing Finance Agency filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge (JM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) of Trial Deadlines by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 OBJECTION to #190 Report and Recommendation by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Response to Objections to R&R due by 4/26/2017. (MMM)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER on Mandate as to #159 USCA Order DISMISSING #150 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/17. (ADR)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #185 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. Remailed to updated address. (MMM)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #159 USCA Order dismissing #150 Notice of Appeal (JM)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #160 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Clarence Moses Willis be granted, and that Defendant's Answer (ECF No. #39 be stricken, and that default be entered against Defendant Willis. Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #183 Klingele Minute Order, addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. Remailed to updated address. (MMM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #176 Order, addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. Remailed to updated address. (MMM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Change of Address by Defendant Geri L. McKinnon. Address updated to c/o 8618 Rileys Ct, Gladstone, OR 97027. (MMM) Modified on 3/28/2017 to reflect correct date filed (MMM).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #180 Order, addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. No other address available, did not resend. (MMM)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that #181 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #181 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #181 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis (MMM)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 3/30/2017. (MMM)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 173 Minutes of Motion Hearing, addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. No other address available, did not resend. (MMM)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER that #177 Request for Pre-Trial Conference is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 180 replaced on 3/14/2017 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #174 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #175 Klingele Minute Order, addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. No other address available, did not resend. (MMM)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REQUEST for Pre-Trial Conference Pursuant to LR 16-2, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER that #174 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #174 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Anthony Sassi; Def Counsel: Clarence Moses Willis, Pro Se; Recording start and end times: 9:36a.m. - 9:54a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to #160 Motion for Sanctions re: Discovery against Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. The Court takes this matter under submission. A report and recommendation will be issued. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STRICKEN per #176 ORDER (MMM) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 3/15/2017. (MMM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY to Response to #160 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #167 Order addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. Envelope marked: return to sender - unable to forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (NEV)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 166 Minute Order addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. Envelope marked: return to sender - unable to forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (NEV)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #168 Response to Motion ; by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE to #160 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Replies due by 3/1/2017. (MMM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that #165 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re #160 Motion for Sanctions is granted. Responses due by 2/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 2/15/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy HenseL. RE: #160 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery against Defendant Clarence Moses Willis Motion Hearing set for Friday, February 24, 2017 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A is hereby RESCHEDULED
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond re #160 Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE by Clarence Moses Willis re response deadline stated in the docket entry for #160 Motion for Sanctions. (MMM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 161 Minute Order addressed to Geri L. McKinnon. Envelope marked: return to sender - unable to forward. Clerk did not resend. (NEV)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #150 Notice of Appeal by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 1/27/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy Hensel. RE: #160 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery against Defendant Clarence Moses Willis Motion Hearing set for Friday, February 24, 2017 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IH)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery against Defendant Clarence Moses Willis by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 2/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sassi, Anthony)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, DISMISSING #150 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. (JM)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number NVLAS046710 re #150 Notice of Appeal (16-17192) from Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER on Mandate as to #155 USCA Mandate re #148 USCA Order DISMISSING #133 Notice of Appeal filed by Ernest C. Aldridge. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/9/16. (MMM)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, re #148 USCA Order DISMISSING #133 Notice of Appeal filed by Ernest C. Aldridge. (ADR)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit re #148 USCA Order as to DISMISSING #133 Notice of Appeal, (JM)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #150 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. USCA Case Number 16-17192. (JM)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Filing fee NOT paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (NEV)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER that #138 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #125 Motion for Hearing is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #139 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, DISMISSING #133 Notice of Appeal filed by Ernest C. Aldridge. (JM)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting #142 Motion to Remove Attorney Krista J. Nielson from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, DISMISSING for lack of jurisdiction #132 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. USCA Case Number 16-16-978. (ADR)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number NVLAS046166 re #132 Notice of Appeal. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RESPONSE to #139 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 11/24/2016. (Sassi, Anthony)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 RESPONSE to #138 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 11/24/2016. (Sassi, Anthony)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Sassi, Anthony) Modified on 11/16/2016 to reflect correct motion type (MMM).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPLY to Response to #121 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE to #125 Motion for Hearing, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for an Order to Expunge Lis Pendens - APN 020-729-15, or in the Alternative, Schedule an NRS 14.015 Hearing to Determine All Elements, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 11/14/2016. (MMM)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for an Order to Expunge Lis Pendens on 230 Flint St. Fernley APN 020-323-06, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 11/14/2016. (MMM)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #133 Notice of Appeal filed by Ernest C. Aldridge, #132 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. USCA Case Number 16-16977. (JM)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #132 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarence Moses Willis. USCA Case Number 16-16978. (ADR) Modified on 10/31/2016 to correct docket entry relationship (TR).
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #133 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (TR)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #132 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (TR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER that #119 and #120 Motions to Reconsider are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #121 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Willis's proposed orders (ECF No. #128 , #130 ) be, and the same hereby are, STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #61 Order on Motion to Strike and #114 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Filing fee $ 505 (NOT paid). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #61 Order on Motion to Strike and #114 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Filing fee $ 505 (NOT paid). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE to #121 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 10/30/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STRICKEN per #131 ORDER (MMM) Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #121 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STRICKEN per #131 ORDER (MMM) Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #121 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ERROR: Document is a duplicate of #126 Response. CORRECTION: Document #127 is terminated as filed in error as a duplicate filing. Response to #120 Objection; filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista) Modified on 10/18/2016 (TR).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE to #120 Objection, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista) Modified on 10/18/2016 to correct docket entry relationship (TR).
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE to #119 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #116 Motion to Strike McKinnon's #93 Affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REQUEST for Hearing on Lis Pendens re 230 Flint St. in Fernley Nevada, parcel No. 020-323-06; filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #121 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 10/20/2016. (MMM)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #107 Order on Motion to Extend Time, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 10/16/2016. (MMM)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 106 Order on Motion to Vacate Hearing, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 10/14/2016. (MMM)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER that defendant Willis's Proposed Order (ECF No. #117 ) is STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STRICKEN per #118 ORDER (MMM) Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #92 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens ; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Strike #93 Affidavit of Fact, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 10/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1)(Nielson, Krista) Modified on 9/23/2016 to create docket entry relationship(TR).
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RESPONSE to #96 Affidavit, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER that #47 and #81 Motions to Dismiss, #74 Motion to Reconsider, and #83 Motion for Sanctions, are DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that #82 Moton for Hearing and Oral Arguments is STRICKEN. FURTHER ORDERED that #66 and #78 Motions to Reconsider are DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that #92 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the notice of pendency of action or lis pendens recorded by plaintiff in relation to this matter, instrument no. 20151228-0001607, as to certain parcel of real property located at 5320 Holmby Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada, 89146, with APN No. 163-01-511-026, be EXPUNGED.FURTHER ORDERED that #80 and #90 Motions for Entry of Clerk's Default are DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY to Response to #82 Motion for Hearing filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY to Response to #81 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY to Response to #83 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Disclose filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM) Modified on 9/21/2016 to reflect correct document link (MMM).
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE to #85 Motion to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE to #92 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 9/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Mountain Moss Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Mountain Moss Quitclaim Deed, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Mountain Moss GBS Deed, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Thunder Spirit Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Thunder Spirit Quitclaim Deed, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Thunder Spirit GBS Deed, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Canadian Drive Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Canadian Drive Quitclaim Deed, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Palma Vista Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Palma Vista Quitclaim Deed, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Palma Vista GBS Deed, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Cornflower Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Cornflower Quitclaim Deed, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Homeria Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Homeria Quitclaim Deed, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Flint Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Flint Quitclaim Deed, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Garden Trustees Deed Upon Sale, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Garden Quitclaim Deed, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20- Garden GBS Deed, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Nevada State Business License, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - CLARENCE MOSES WILLIS Clark County, Nevada fictitious firm name application, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - State of Nevada Sales Tax Permit, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24 - City of Las Vegas, Nevada business license, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25 - CLARENCE MOSES WILLIS Lyon County, Nevada fictitious firm name application, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26 - CLARENCE MOSES WILLIS Washoe County, Nevada fictitious firm name application)(Nielson, Krista)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER that #86 Motion for Protective Order is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall serve his responses to Plaintiffs written discovery requests, including interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admission, to Plaintiff by September 27, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER that #85 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED. Discovery due by 3/17/2017. Motions due by 4/14/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2016 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Krista Nielson; Def Counsel: None Present; Court Reporter/FTR #: 3:41p.m. - 3:48p.m.; Time of Hearing: 3:30p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; Clarence Moses Willis, Pro Se is not present. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to #85 First Motion to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines and #86 Motion for Protective Order.The Court grants #85 First Motion to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines.For the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies #86 Motion for Protective Order. Mr. Willis is given fourteen (14) days from today's date in which to serve responses to the discovery request. #103 Motion to Vacate Hearing for September 13, 2016 and #104 Amended Motion to Vacate Hearing for September 13, 2016 are denied. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE re: Non-Representation, filed by Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC, Geri L. McKinnon. (Crosby, David)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate Hearing Scheduled September 13, 2016 re Insufficient Notice by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Scheduled 9/13/2016 by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (NEV)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE to #83 Motion for Sanctions/ Non-Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 9/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidaviat of Krista J. Nielson, Esq., in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure)(Nielson, Krista)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE to #82 Motion for Hearing, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 9/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Krista J. Nielson, Esq., in Support of Oppostion to Motion to Dismiss)(Nielson, Krista)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE to #81 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 9/16/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT re #90 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, ; by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to #86 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 9/12/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY to Response to #80 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT re #80 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 8/31/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: #86 MOTION for Protective Order, #85 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Motion Hearing set for September 12, 2016 is RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, September 13, 2016 at 3:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT re: #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing - part 1 of 2, #2 Notice of Filing - part 2 of 2)(MMM)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STRICKEN per #123 Order. (SLD)AFFIDAVIT re: #1 COMPLAINT; filed by Defendant Geri L. McKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(MMM)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 9/15/2016. (MMM)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #90 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Krista J. Nielson, Esq. in support of Application for Entry of Clerk's Default for Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC, and Geri L. Mckinnon)(Nielson, Krista)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #85 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 8/23/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy Hensel. RE: #85 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, #86 Motion for Protective Order Motion Hearing set for September 12, 2016 at 3:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Defendant Willis may appear telephonically. To appear telephonically, the party is instructed to call telephone number: (888) 251-2909, access code 7771745 five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IH)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE to #80 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Replies due by 9/1/2016. (MMM)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #81 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Damages and Sanctions by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 9/5/2016. (MMM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STRICKEN per #114 ORDER (MMM) MOTION for Hearing and Oral Argument re #81 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM) .
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Disclose and for Abuse of Process by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 9/5/2016. (MMM)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Nielson, Krista)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE to #78 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 8/11/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #77 Order on Motion to Quash by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 7/31/2016. (MMM)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that #71 Motion to Quash Subpoenas is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to #74 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 7/7/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that #33 and #36 Motions to Extend Time are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that #34 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #72 Order on Motion to Compel by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 6/26/2016. (MMM)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Response to #71 Motion to Quash filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM) Modified event on 6/10/2016 (EDS).
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying ECF No. #68 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 5/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas; filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Handley, Laurel)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to #66 Amended Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #61 Order on Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (SLD)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to #66 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order ; filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Compel Disclosure by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 6/2/2016. (JM)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUBPOENAS Issued. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Issued)(JM)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #61 Order on Motion to Strike by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 5/19/2016. (MMM)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #61 Order on Motion to Strike by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 5/13/2016. (MMM)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #56 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/19/2016. Motions due by 10/19/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 04/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that #33 and #36 Defendant's Motions for Extension of Time are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that #46 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OBJECTION to #56 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order ; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to #47 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to #46 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association re #41 Amended Complaint. Ernest C. Aldridge served on 3/29/2016, answer due 4/19/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 4/6/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: #56 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Defendant, Clarence Moses Willis, shall have until Wednesday, April 13, 2016 to file an objection to the proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. If no opposition is received, the Court will approve the proposed discovery plan. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that #42 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for Monday, April 4, 2016 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE to #47 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 4/10/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 4/7/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than 04/04/2016 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 03/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Nielson, Krista)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss #41 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 3/31/2016. (MMM)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Strike #41 Amended Complaint by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. Responses due by 3/26/2016. (MMM)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. (MMM)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 3/1/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: #42 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Motion Hearing set for Monday, April 4, 2016 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Plaintiff is not required to comply with the disputed subpoenas until the Court rules on the pending motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION of Counsel re #42 Motion to Quash ; by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Quash re #38 Subpoena Issued by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 6/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Nielson, Krista)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE to #34 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 3/3/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STRICKEN per #202 ORDER (MMM) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Clarence Moses Willis.(MMM)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUBPOENAS Issued. (MMM)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 30 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Motion Hearing,, held on January 26, 2016, before Judge James C. Mahan. Court Reporter: Kathy Eismann, 702-431-1919. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (KE)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SECOND MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #34 Motion to Dismiss, : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Ernest C. Aldridge. Responses due by 2/20/2016. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/13/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/19/2016. (MMM)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to Legal Owner Aldridge Pite, LLP: $ 500.00, receipt number NVLAS039796; on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 receipt) (MMM)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2016 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Krista Nielson; Def Counsel: Clarence Moses Willis -Appearing pro se; Court Reporter/FTR #: Kathy Eismann; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 6B; Representations of the parties are heard.COURT ORDERED: granting #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction.; bond continues. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that #25 Motion to Vacate Preliminary Injunction Hearing is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC served on 1/21/2016, answer due 2/11/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #25 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES. Justice Court #12C009706; Justice Court #15C007983; by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Vacate Motion Hearing set for January 26, 2016; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #19 Order on Ex Parte Motion; filed by Defendant Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE re: Service; filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Geri L. McKinnon served on 1/3/2016, answer due 1/24/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Clarence Moses Willis served on 1/14/2016, answer due 2/4/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Ernest C. Aldridge served on 1/14/2016, answer due 2/4/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 17 Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants and/or all persons acting concert or participation with them, or any of them, are prohibited from: attempting to execute additional quitclaim deeds and/or recording any kind of conveyance against the subject properties or any properties owned by plaintiff Fannie Mae. FURTHER ORDERED that this temporary restraining order shall be effective upon the posting by plaintiff of a bond in the amount of $500.00. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to appear for hearing and oral argument regarding #18 plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on January 26, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6B. FURTHER ORDERED that, to ensure defendants receive timely notice of the hearing, plaintiff may, in addition to the requirements set forth in Rules 4 and 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, serve its motions, this order and all other pleadings filed to date on defendants by electronic mail.FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file and serve opposition papers, if any, no later than January 19, 2016 by 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply, if any, no later than January 22, 2016 by 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 1/21/2016. (Nielson, Krista)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Federal National Mortgage Association that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. . (Nielson, Krista)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ernest C. Aldridge, Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC, Geri L. McKinnon, Clarence Moses Willis. (MMM)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Nielson, Krista)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Nielson, Krista)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Nielson, Krista)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Nielson, Krista)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #6 , #7 , #8 and #9 Proposed Summons to be issued: ERROR: Summons not issued, not properly formatted pursuant to FRCP 4C. CORRECTION : Attorney Krista Nielson advised to download and properly complete Proposed Summons, on the approved summons forms provided by the Court in accordance with FRCP 4C. Then refile completed summons as a separate event using Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and properly link the Notice of Correction to the corresponding proposed summons entered on the docket. (no image attached)(RFJ)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista) Corrected image #14 attached on 12/17/2015 (RFJ).
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista) Corrected image #12 attached on 12/17/2015 (RFJ).
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista) Corrected image #13 attached on 12/17/2015 (RFJ).
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista) Corrected image #11 attached on 12/17/2015 (RFJ).
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association. (Nielson, Krista)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: re: Attorney Laurel Handley. Attorney address information listed on #1 Complaint does not match CM/ECF account information. Pursuant to Local Rules (LSR 2-2), and Special Order 109, it is the responsibility of all attorneys to maintain and update their information in the case file and the CM/ECF system. It is therefore recommended that Laurel Handley review and update their CM/ECF account information. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MMM)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MMM)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3922463), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/20/2015. Proof of service due by 4/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nielson, Krista) Corrected image #49 of cover sheet with certificate of service attached on 3/25/2016 (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Laurel I. Handley
Represented By: Anthony R Sassi
Represented By: Jory C. Garabedian
Represented By: Krista Nielson
Represented By: Stephanie A. Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest C. Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Solutions 4 U, LLC
Represented By: Jared B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge M. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irena Damianova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Moses Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geri L. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?