Icon Pac Nevada Owner Pool 3 Nevada, LLC v. Biogel Innovative Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Icon Pac Nevada Owner Pool 3 Nevada, LLC
Defendant: American Oil Products, Inc., Awax International, Inc., Biogel Innovative Group, LLC and United Pharma LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv02391
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 75 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation of Dismissal. As this dismissal ends this case, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that 58 Motion to Continue Settlement conference is GRANTED. Settlement Conference continued to 9/30/2016 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. FURTHER ORDERED that 57 Motion to Have a Different Attorney Attend is DENIED. All of the requirements set forth in the previous scheduling order, Docket No. 55 , remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Remove Attorney Justin A. Shiroff from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 06/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the discovery hearing scheduled for 1:00 p.m., April 13, 2016 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that a discovery hearing is scheduled for 1:00 p.m., April 13, 2016, in courtroom 3D. The hearing will be vacated upon the filing of the discovery plan and scheduling order in compliance with Local Rule 26-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icon Pac Nevada Owner Pool 3 Nevada, LLC v. Biogel Innovative Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Oil Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awax International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biogel Innovative Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icon Pac Nevada Owner Pool 3 Nevada, LLC
Represented By: John S Delikanakis
Represented By: Justin A Shiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?