Bartech Systems International, Inc. v. Mobile Simple Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bartech Systems International, Inc.
Defendant: Mobile Simple Solutions (IAS), Inc., Mobile Simple Solutions, Inc., Christelle Pigeat and Vincent Tessier
Counter Defendant: Bartech Systems International, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Mobile Simple Solutions, Inc., Christelle Pigeat and Vincent Tessier
Case Number: 2:2015cv02422
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER granting 527 Stipulation to Stay Case and Remove Trial date. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting ECF No. 520 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Snell & Willmer and attorneys Adam Q. Tully; V. R. Bohman and Alex Fugazzi terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER that the motion for leave to file third amended complaint ECF Nos. 501 / 502 is GRANTED. Third Amended Complaint to be filed and served no later than 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER that the motion to seal is DENIED. Docket No. 500 . The Court INSTRUCTS the Clerk's Office to unseal the document at Docket No. 501 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER that the Court DEFERS ruling on ECF No. 500 Motion to Seal; Court INSTRUCTS Clerk's Office to maintain ECF No. 500 under seal until ruling from the Court; any response from Defendant GEM shall be filed no later than 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDERED that Bartech's application for relief on default judgment (ECF No. 378 ) is denied without prejudice to Bartech to refile within fourteen (14) days from the conclusion of trial. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting ECF No. 379 Motion to Seal Portions of Exhibits 2 and 3 to Plaintiff's Application for Relief Against Defendant Mobile Simple Solutions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting ECF No. 486 Defendant Tessier's motion to extend time to file a pretrial order. A pretrial order shall be filed no later than 8/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER Reassigning Case 2:18-cv-00212-GMN to District Judge Miranda M. Du. All future filings must bear case number 2:18-cv-00212-MMD. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting 474 Stipulation to continue Motion hearing. The hearing set for April 19, 2018 at 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Judge Miranda M. Du is vacated. The matter will be reset by the Courtroom Administrator. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to reconsider ECF No. 455 and Snell's request for attorneys' fees ECF No. 460 are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting ECF No. 466 Stipulation for Extension of Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Deadline (Ninth Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2018. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER that Defendant GEM's motion to extend the joint proposed pretrial order (ECF No. 456 ) is granted in part; the joint proposed pretrial order is due 4/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 442 Status Report; the Court ORDERS Defendant to produce documents in response to Plaintiff's Requests for Production 7, 15, 16, and 20 and FURTHER ORDERS Defendant to provide complete and truthful responses to Interrogatories 15, 16, 17, and 20, no later than 03/12/2018/; GRANTS Plaintiff's request for sanctions and ORDERS that Plaintiff is entitled to its reasonable fees and costs in bringing the instant joint statement; denying as moot ECF No. 446 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting ECF No. 437 Request for Extension to Exchange Discovery Arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER approving ECF No. 430 Stipulation: Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting ECF No. 418 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 406 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 12/18/2017. Replies due by 12/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER denying ECF No. 366 Motion to Compel; parties to meet and confer no later than 12/29/2017; parties to file joint statement by 1/16/2018; plaintiff to deliver courtesy copy of joint statement to Judge Koppe, Clerk's office no later than 3:00 p.m. on 01/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER regarding ECF No. 409 Mail Returned. Ms. Pigeat is to file a written notice of change of address by 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER Re ECF No. 392 Minutes of Proceeding held November 6, 2017 re ECF Nos. 342 , 343 Motions : Defendant GEM SA must: (1) Immediately cease selling, leasing, renting, or offering for sale, lease, rent or subscription any version of the A Breez software as specified herein; (2) Provide notice via electronic and regular mail in the form of Exhibit A to this Order to any customer using ABreez; and (3) Defendant GEM shall file proofs of service for each notice sent to each customer as specified herein. (See pdf Order for details and specifics; proofs of service due within 5 days of this Order.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 362 Stipulation to Reopen Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting ECF No. 345 Stipulation to add GEM SA as a Party to the Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER striking ECF No. 340 Demand for Prior Discovery; instructing the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER - Response to ECF No. 327 Motion due by 6/20/2017; Reply due by 6/23/2017. The Court INSTRUCTS the Clerk's office to serve this order on Defendant Tessier by e-mail at vintessier@gmail.com. (Ad hoc email service (NEF) to vintessier@gmail.com on 6/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting Bartech's ECF No. 260 Submission; directing Defendants Mobile Simple Solutions (IAS) Inc and Vincent Tessier to pay Bartech $55,292.00 in reasonable attorney's fees incurred in connection with Bartech's ECF Nos. 117 , 121 Second Motion for Contempt within 10 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting ECF No. 283 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint by 5/10/2017, ECF No. 283 -2 as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/08/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 247 Amended Motion to Strike "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation From Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER - Defendant's motion to compel, Docket No. 239 , is hereby DENIED. Plaintiff is not required to provide documents to Defendant prior to reviewing them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER re ECF No. 254 Order, ECF No. 255 -1 Proposed Order, and ECF No. 268 Minutes of Proceedings. (See pdf Order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting in part ECF No. 238 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery; directing Plaintiff to file a renewed motion for attorneys' fees by 5/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER dismissing all counts in Defendant Mobile Canada's ECF No. 13 Counterclaims; directing that Default Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Bartech, and against Defendant Mobile Canaca, on all counts in Bartech's ECF No. [ 1]-32 First Amended Complaint; directing that said Default Judgment be in an amount and for such other relief that the Court determines upon application of Plaintiff Bartech. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER vacating the deposition of Defendant Pigeat; directing Plaintiff to respond to Defendat's ECF No. 223 Motion for Protective Order by 2/13/2017 - Reply due by 2/15/2017; directing Clerk to serve this order on Defendant Pigeat via e-mail (sent 2/8/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting ECF No. 173 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant is ordered to pay $4,035 to Plaintiff no later than 02/15/2017. Clerk is instructed to serve Defendant Pigeat by e-mail at christelle.pigeat@gmail.com (e-served 01/26/2017). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 01/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER that Defendant's motion to stay ECF No. 204 (Notice of Bankruptcy), filed by Christelle Pigeat is DENIED without prejudice. Any renewed motion must address the proper standards and comply with the Courts Local Rules. Clerk directed to serve this order on Defendant Pigeat by e-mail at christelle.pigeat@gmail.com. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER vacating ECF No. 179 Order staying this case as to Defendant Mobile Simple Solutions Inc. An automatic stay will be imposed only if Defendant demonstrates that the U.S. Bankruptcy Court has recognized its Canadian bankruptcy proceeding as the "foreign main proceeding." Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting ECF No. 190 Motion for Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 8:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe - no exceptions to personal appearance requirements; directing Clerk to serve order via email to Defendants Pigeat and Tessier (ad hoc NEFs sent 1/11/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 159 Motion to Compel depostition : Defendant shall appear for her deposition no later than December 16, 2016. Plaintiff shall file, no later than December 9, 2016, the amount of attorneys' fees and costs it seeks to recover, along with all appropriate support for the requested fees. Any response to Plaintiffs request shall be filed no later than December 30, 2016, and any reply shall be filed by January 6, 2017. The Court INSTRUCTS the Clerks Office to serve this order on Defendant Pigeat by e-mail at christelle.pigeat@gmail.com. (Email sent 12/2/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting pro se Defendant Christelle Pigeat's ECF No. 165 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting 140 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Plaintiffs attorneys may appear telephonically by calling the Court conference line at 877-402- 9757 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The conference code is 6791056. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re ECF No. 130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, setting Motion Hearing for 9/29/2016 at 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Any response to the motion due by 9/22/2016. (See order for appearance requirements.) Defendants' current counsel of record to serve Defendants with this order no later than 9/19/2016 and file proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's ECF Nos. 16 , 67 , 87 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting Defendants' ECF No. 41 Motion to File an Errata. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 86 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting ECF No. 84 Unopposed Motion to Suspend Local Rules for a Limited Purpose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re ECF No. 82 Notice, directing that ECF Nos. 67 and 71 be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 66 Motion to Seal; instructing Clerk's Office to keep ECF Nos. 16 , 38 , 42 , 47 , and 57 sealed for time being; directing the parties to file a renewed motion by 5/4/2016 (see order for de tails); directing Plaintiff by 5/2/2016 to file notice as to whether it intends to file its redacted motion for preliminary injunction and reply (ECF Nos. 67 , 71 ) under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 23 Motion to Stay and Denying 25 Motion for Hearing. Defendants may renew those motions no later than 1/25/2016. Any response shall be filed no later than 1/26/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartech Systems International, Inc. v. Mobile Simple Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bartech Systems International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Kealy
Represented By: Gregory T. Lawrence
Represented By: Ashley C. Nikkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartech Systems International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Kealy
Represented By: Gregory T. Lawrence
Represented By: Ashley C. Nikkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Simple Solutions (IAS), Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Simple Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christelle Pigeat
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Tessier
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mobile Simple Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Christelle Pigeat
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vincent Tessier
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Sherry Ly
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?