Riekki v. Bayview Financial Loan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Mona G Riekki
Defendant: Bank of America, Bayview Financial Loan Servicing, CCO Mortgage, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage
Interested Party: Midland Mortgage Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv02434
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant CCO Mortgage. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 11 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Amended Complaint due within 14 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riekki v. Bayview Financial Loan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Financial Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCO Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: V. R. Bohman
Represented By: Charles E Gianelloni
Represented By: Bob L. Olson
Represented By: Alyssa M. Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Midland Mortgage Company
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona G Riekki
Represented By: Sara Khosroabadi
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?