Tagle v. Dept of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Victor Tagle
Respondent: Dept of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv02506
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that Plaintiff's 141 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus is Denied and Plaintiff's 142 Motion Requesting Submission of his 141 Writ of Mandamus is Denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Directing Service. The clerk of court is directed to reissue summons to the Department of Homeland Security and William Barr, to fully complete the USM-285 Form, and to deliver the same, with copies of the Second Amended Complaint and this orde r, to the U.S. Marshal for service. FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and Second Amended Complaint by registered or certified mail. FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal shall file with the court proof of mailing and return receipts. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re 111 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Victor Tagle is deemed a vexatious litigant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Victor Tagle is required to seek leave of Court befo re filing any additional actions in the District of Nevada. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Victor Tagle is prohibited from filing any further motions in this case seeking relief that the court has already denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 83 Motion to Change Venue; ORDER denying 85 Motion; ORDER denying 95 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER denying 97 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER denying 98 Motion for Hearing; ORDER denying 101 Motio n for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER denying 103 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER denying 105 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER overruling 110 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons. Tagle has 20 days in which to furnish the USM copies of the 285 forms. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: 285 to P - JM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER that Plaintiff's motions for intervention and speedy trial (ECF Nos. 88 , 91 , 93 , 96 , 100 , 102 , 104 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 68 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER denying 69 Motion; ORDER denying 70 Motion; ORDER denying 71 Motion; ORDER denying 73 Motion; ORDER denying 74 Motion; ORDER denying 77 Motion; ORDER denying 81 Motion; OR DER denying 82 Motion for Hearing; ORDER denying 84 Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to reissue summons Service must be accomplished by November 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, 285 Form to USM - JM)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that 62 Motion to Continue Case and/or Issue Needed Forms is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 64 Request for Waiver of Summons is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to reissue summons to the named defendant(s) herein, and deliver same wi th copies of the Second Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service, and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff has twenty (20) days in which to furnish to the U.S. Marshal the required Forms USM-285. Service must be accomplished by November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank USM 285 form to plaintiff - MMM)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 59 Motion; ORDER denying 63 Motion; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that Plaintiff's Demand of Transfer and Affidavit and Request for Transfer to Federal Facilities (ECF Nos. 50 , 52 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that 45 Order to Show Cause is deemed satisfied and I will not dismiss this action at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send plaintiff Victor Tagle a copy of 36 Judge Ferenbach's November 15, 2018 order. FURTHE R ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to the named defendant(s) and deliver same with copies of 35 the Second Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall have 20 days in which to furnish to the U.S. Marshal the required Forms USM285. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's Order 30 is affirmed, Tagle's objection 32 is overruled, and Tagle's request to have Magistrate Judge Ferenbach investigated 33 is denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to the named defendant(s) and deliver same with copies of the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 35 ) to the U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days in which to furnis h to the U.S. Marshal the required Forms USM-285. Within twenty (20) days after receiving from the U.S. Marshal a copy of the Form USM-285 showing whether service has been accomplished, plaintiff must file a notice with the Court identifying which defendants were served and which were not served, if any. Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service must be accomplished within 90 days from the date that the Complaint was filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank 285 form to plaintiff - MMM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that Tagle has until December 1, 2017 to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 24 Request for Investigation under 42 U.S.C. § 1985 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 12 Report and Recommendation is accepted with the modification that I will grant Tagle another opportunity to amend his complaint consistent with the directions in this order. Tagle must file his amended complaint on or before June 3, 2016 or his complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that 7 Motion for a Copy of the Report and Recommendation is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of the Report and Recommendation and Order affirming the Report and Recommendation (# 2 and # 5 ) to Plaintiff Tagle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that 2 Report and Recommendation is accepted and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff Victor Tagle shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Motion for Speedy Trial is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagle v. Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?