ServiceLink NLS, LLC v. Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: ServiceLink NLS, LLC
Defendant: Caren Castle, Lawrence Castle, Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLC, Stephanie Cooper Herdman and Aaron Waite
Unknown: James D Miller
Case Number: 2:2016cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. ServiceLink's claims dismissed without prejudice. As to Cooper Castle, ServiceLink's claim is dismissed without prejudice. Amended Complaint may be filed within 14 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation re 29 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/9/2016. Replies due by 5/25/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Caren Castle; Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLC; Aaron Waite answer due 4/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ServiceLink NLS, LLC v. Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caren Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Cooper Herdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServiceLink NLS, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: James D Miller
Represented By: Raleigh C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?