Gant v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Lemar Gant
Defendant: Byrnes, Hunt, Johnson, Sandoral and Brain Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv00011
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that Gant's claims against remaining defendants Brcic (aka Brck), Johnson, and Chipo are DISMISSED without prejudice under FRCP 4(m), and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in these defendants favor.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Lemar Gant must SHOW CAUSE by June 4, 2018 why the claims against Brcic, Johnson, and Chipo should not be dismissed under Rule 4(m). If Gant fails to respond by this deadline or does not demonstrate good cause, his claims against these remaining defendants will be dismissed without further notice, and this case will be closed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that the defendants file exact copies of the exhibits attached to Gant's opposition on or before Wednesday, May 2, 2018. The exhibits must be filed as a Notice in Response to Court Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that 51 Gant's Objection to Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's order is SUSTAINED, and 48 Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's Order is REVERSED and set aside. The Clerk of Court is directed to send the U.S. Marshal copies of the summon ses for Defendants Johnson and Brcic (ECF Nos. 5 , 36 , 38 ) and two copies (one for each defendant) of the amended complaint and this order. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send Gant two USM 285 forms and three copies of this order.FUR THER ORDERED that Gant must complete the USM 285 forms and send them to the U.S. Marshal within 20 days of receiving this order. Gant is further ordered to send a copy of this order with each of the USM 285 forms. When the U.S. Marshal sends back a c ompleted USM 285 form, Gant will have 20 days to file a notice regarding service on both defendants with the Clerk of Court.FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal is directed to effectuate service on Defendants Brcic and Johnson in accordance with this order. Before filing the completed USM 285 forms or sending them to Gant, the U.S. Marshal MUST REDACT the addresses from the forms. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: two USM 285 forms & three copies of order to plaintiff - MMM)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that 58 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED and the following discovery deadlines apply: Discovery due by 1/19/2018. Motions due by 2/20/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that 49 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until October 18, 2017 to answer Defendants' Interrogatories. The following discovery deadlines apply: Discovery cut-off: November 2, 2017; Last day to file dispositive motions: December 4, 2017; Date for filing Pretrial Order: January 3, 2018. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to strike 52 Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that 43 Motion to Produce Court Order Ordering Marshal to Serve Complaint and Summons is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER accepting and adopting 32 Report and Recommendation. It is further ORDERED that Gant's motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 22 , 23 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Seal 36 and 38 Summons Issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that a hearing on 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Properly Identify Defendants Not Served, and Request to Have Court Order Marshal to Serve Defendant Under Seal is scheduled for 10:00 AM, April 10, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Plaintiff may appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall SEND a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office and to the NDOC Chief of Inmate Services. The Clerk of t he Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF No. 5 ) on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Subject to the findings of the screening order (ECF No. 6 ), within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff regarding acceptance of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gant v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lemar Gant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?