Las Vegas Development Group, LLC v. Evergreen Moneysource Mortgage Company, et al
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation, Tracy Burr, Evergreen Moneysource Mortgage Company, Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Steven P. Schneider
Counter Claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Cross Defendant: Hollow De Oro Homeonwers Association
Counter Defendant: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00038
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation to Stay Pending Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation to Extend Time re 49 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Replies due by 3/29/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re 49 MOTION to Remand to State Court . ( Replies due by 3/22/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re 49 MOTION to Remand to State Court . ( Replies due by 3/8/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Stay Discovery (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Extend Time to File Discovery Plan (First Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation to Extend to Respond to Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 3/28/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than March 21, 2016 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Extend Time for Hollow De Oro Homeowners Association to File a Reply brief in Support of 8 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/8/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association to File a Response to 8 MOTION to Dismiss (Second Request).The parties hereto agree that Nationstar and FNMA shall have an additional period of time until and including Tuesday, 2/16/16. Nationstar and FNMA request this additional time to fully address the issues raised in the HOA's Motion. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association to File Response to 8 MOTION to Dismiss (First Request). The parties hereto agree that Nationstar and FNMA shall have an additional period of time until and including 2/8/16. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED counsel for Defendant shall file a Statement in Removal which fully complies with the minutes of the Court 5 no later than 2/16/16. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an Order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC v. Evergreen Moneysource Mortgage Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation
Represented By: Jessica E. Chong
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Moneysource Mortgage Company
Represented By: Michael A. Arata
Represented By: Leonard T. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hollow De Oro Homeonwers Association
Represented By: David T. Gluth II
Represented By: Robert S. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?