Silvagni v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy Silvagni
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00039
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Re: 74 Notice of Settlement. The settlement conference set in this case is VACATED. Dismissal papers shall be filed by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED ORDER. Settlement Conference continued to 6/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Given the trial date already set, no further continuances of the settlement conference will be granted. Settlement conference statements shall be submitted by 3:00 p.m. on 6/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Defendant's 41 and 43 Motions to Exclude Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 41 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosed Claim for Loss of Earning Capacity, 42 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosed Claim for Future Lum bar Spine Surgery. 43 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosed Claim for Hip Surgery. Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Defendant's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendant's 32 Motion to Exclude. Any renewed motions must be filed in accordance with the instructions outlined in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re Defendant's 32 Motion to Exclude. The Court sets that motion for a hearing on 2/14/2017 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Reopen Discovery. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Counsel shall appear telephonically by calling the Court conference line at 877-402-9757 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Extend the Close of Discovery (Second Request) and Motion for Leave to Allow Plaintiff to again Supplement/Amend Computation of Damages in her Rule 26 Disclosures. The aspect of the Motion re leave to supp lement is Denied. Plaintiff seeks an extension of the discovery cutoff. A Response to this portion of the Motion is due by 9/13/2016. Any Reply is due by 9/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying without prejudice 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Allow a Supplemental Initial Disclosure and to Extend Certain Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/22/2016. Motions due by 9/21/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Court sets a hearing on the 10 Motion to Allow Supplemental Initial Disclosure and to Extend Certain Deadlines for 4/28/2016 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Motion for Leave to Allow Plaintiff to Supplement/Amend Computation of Damages in Rule 26 Disclosures. Responses due by 4/22/2016. Replies due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvagni v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Silvagni
Represented By: Christopher D. Burk
Represented By: Scott Poisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Ryan Kerbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?