Johnson v. Kraft Foods et al
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Defendant: Keefe Group and Kraft Foods
Case Number: 2:2016cv00042
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that this action is dismissed with prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Court's order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 24 ) is overruled; Kraft's first motion to dismiss (ECF No. 30 ) and second motion to dismiss (ECF No. 38 ) are granted; the FAC is dismissed without prejudice and with le ave to amend; Amended complaint due 9/27/2018; Should Plaintiff file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must also submit the proper Form USM-285 with the amended complaint for service of process; Failure to file an amended complaint within that time frame will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that the parties must file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 3/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that ECF No. 35 Plaintiff's Request for Mediation Hearing Pending Dispositive Motions is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 23 ) may proceed. Clerk of Court shall file the Amended Complaint (Previously filed by clerk on 10/27/2017; ECF No. 23 .) Clerk shall issue summons to Defendants named in the complaint and deliver the summons to the USM for service. Henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendants or their attorney a copy of every document submitted for consideration by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 10/31/2017 to reflect USM-285 forms mailed to P 11/1/2017 (DRM).
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 16 ) and Motion for an Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 17 ) are denied. without prejudice as premature. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for a Status Check (ECF No. 19 ) is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF Nos. 4 , 8 , and 11 Motions for Screening Order. The Court will enter a screening order in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 8/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Status Check without prejudice as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kraft Foods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keefe Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?