Soto v. Aria Resort & Casino, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mr. William Soto
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, Robert Fishbourne, Jerald Hedrick, Yong Hoon Lee, Todd Owen and Melanie Saljougui
Case Number: 2:2016cv00064
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying without prejudice 134 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and mailed to filer 6/12/2020 - DRS)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Denying 118 and 121 Motions for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 123 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Philippe Rouas. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that Defendants' 88 and 89 Motions for Summary Judgment are Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Aria Resort and Casino, LLC, Yong Hoon Lee, Jerald Hedrick, Robert Fishbourne, Todd Owens, a nd Melanie Saljougui on all of Soto's claims, leaving only Soto's claims against Philippe Rouas remaining. Plaintiff has until 9/13/2017 to obtain default against Rouas and move for a default judgment. Aria Defendants' 87 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is Denied. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Obtain Counsel. Plaintiff shall have until 2/8/2017 to retain substitute counsel who shall make an appearance in this case. If counsel has not made an appearance by the deadline , Plaintiff will be representing himself effective 2/8/2017 in all further proceedings. No further extension will be granted. Plaintiff has until 3/3/2017 to file Responses to 88 and 89 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 94 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Robert A Rabbat for Defendant Philippe Rouas. Defendant has until 2/13/2017 to retain substitute counsel who shall make an appearance. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the Plaintiff with a copy of this Order at his last known address (see Order for address). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Defendant Philippe Rouas - SLD)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 86 Ex Parte Motion re 44 First Amended Complaint. Defendant Philippe Rouas' answer due 1/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 80 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys James P. Kemp and Victoria Lynn Neal as counsel for Plaintiff. Plaintiff has until 11/21/2016 to retain substitute counsel. A status check re Plaintiff's counsel will be conducted 11/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m., in conjunction with the 70 Motion to Compel which is also set for the same date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the 14 Motion to Dismiss and 15 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement is DENIED as moot without prejudice. The hearing on these motions scheduled for 5/2/2016 at 1:30 p.m. is VACATED. Soto and Aria's 23 Stipulation is approved in all other respects. Aria's deadline to respond to the amended complaint is extended to 3/18/2016. The 13 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the 1 Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Aria Resort & Casino, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino, LLC
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fishbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yong Hoon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Saljougui
Represented By: John G George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. William Soto
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?