Gomez v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Gomez
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Brian Santarossa
Case Number: 2:2016cv00086
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that 26 and 27 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of all defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 26 and 27 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 26 and 27 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/17/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 35 replaced on 12/19/2017 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that a Hearing on 31 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is scheduled for 10/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. FURTHER ORDERED that Daniel Gomez must appear in person at the 10:00 AM, October 16, 2017, hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gomez
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Santarossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?