Kwist v. Harrah's Las Vegas, LLC
Plaintiff: Karla K. Kwist
Defendant: Harrah's Las Vegas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00095
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 9/30/2016 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 8/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Amended Complaint and Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Harrah's Las Vegas, LLC answer due 4/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwist v. Harrah's Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrah's Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla K. Kwist
Represented By: Maile Lani Esteban-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?