Maxson v. H&R Block, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Maxson
Defendant: H&R Block, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00152
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel.; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice.; denying as moot 23 Motion to Stay.; Case terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Stay; Responses for 19 20 and 23 Motions due by 4/12/2017. It is denied in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Plaintiff Kimberly A. Maxson's First Motion for an Expansion of Time to File Response(s) to Doc Nos. 19, 20, 23 and 24 (ECF No. 25 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated in this order. Plaintiff must file a response to De fendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay (ECF Nos. 19, 20) and Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. 23) within 30 days from the date of this order. The court will defer ruling on Defenda nts motion to stay discovery until it is fully briefed. FURTHER ORDERED that 27 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Motion to Stay the Early Neutral Evaluation is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Early Neutral Evaluation set for January 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically; Granting 13 Motion to Extend Time to File Waiver or Complete Service. Proof of service due by 11/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Order to Plaintiff - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxson v. H&R Block, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Maxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?