The Board of Trustees et al v. Noorda et al
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees in their capacities as Trustees of the National Roofers Union Health and Welfare Fund, The Board of Trustees in their capacities as Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Fund, The Board of Trustees in their capacities as Trustees of the Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund and The Board of Trustees in their capcities as Trustees of the Roofers Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund Local 162 for Claric Esmeralda Lincoln & South NYE Counties
Defendant: Foursquare Roofs & Walls Inc., Elise H. Noorda and Lamar Noorda
Case Number: 2:2016cv00170
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Dismissing and Closing Case and Directing Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 78 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to a magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees has been entered. Attorneys Fees and Costs awarded to Plaintiffs. See 72 Order for details. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Vacating 46 Order re proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The court will require Plaintiff's to serve their 41 motion for contempt on Mr. Mendez and to file proof of that service by 5/30/2017. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Dispositive Motions (First Request). Motions due by 3/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Noorda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foursquare Roofs & Walls Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Blum
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise H. Noorda
Represented By: Jonathan D. Blum
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Noorda
Represented By: Jonathan D. Blum
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees in their capacities as Trustees of the National Roofers Union Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees in their capacities as Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees in their capacities as Trustees of the Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees in their capcities as Trustees of the Roofers Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund Local 162 for Claric Esmeralda Lincoln & South NYE Counties
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?