Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v First Light Homeowners Association, et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: Luis Austin, Roger Eisel, First Light Homeowners Association and Nicklin Property Management
Case Number: 2:2016cv00182
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that a Discovery Hearing is set for 6/2/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Luis Austin, Roger Eisel, First Light Homeowners Association, and Nicklin Property Management answer due 3/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v First Light Homeowners Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Eisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Light Homeowners Association
Represented By: Troy L Isaacson
Represented By: Timothy S. Menter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicklin Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Kym S. Cushing
Represented By: John H. Podesta
Represented By: Douglas M Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?