Williams v. Bank of America, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: Michael E. Williams
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon, Countrywide Home Loan, Inc. and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00199
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List; Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/28/2020.; Attorney Dana Jonathon Nitz terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Dismissing Case for want of Prosecution. Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Reopen Case; ORDER granting 44 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that Bank of America, North America, and Bank of New York's Motions to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF Nos. 5 and 8 ) are GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 35 replaced on 7/18/2016 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 4/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a notice with the court disclosing all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) that have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case no later than 3/18/2016. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the court will allow the parties to fully brief Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction before ruling on the merits. Defendants' responses are due 14 days from the date of this order and Plaintiff's reply is due 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Bank of America, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loan, Inc.
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?