Neaman et al v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Neaman and Spencer Neaman
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv00217
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Stipulated Settlement; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 67 Motion in Limine; ORDER denying 70 Motion in Limine; ORDER denying 71 Motion in Limine; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Stipulation; Status Conference reset for 6/1/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 62 Motion; Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Strike (see order for details); The United States shall have until March 8, 2018 to designate a rebuttal expert. The parties' requests for monetary sanctions are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Alter Court Practice and Schedule for Trial; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 33 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss Counts Two and Four of the Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs shall file their certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 03/10/2016. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neaman et al v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Neaman
Represented By: Anthony Julian Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Neaman
Represented By: Anthony Julian Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?