Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. v. Clark County
Plaintiff: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.
Defendant: Clark County
Case Number: 2:2016cv00238
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 67 the County's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Su mmary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 81 the County's Motion in Limine is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 89 the County's Motion for Leave to File Reply is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 91 Pla intiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 93 the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER that 72 Motion to Reopen Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 72 MOTION to Reopen Discovery. (Replies due by 6/9/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Matthew S Carter withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 14 the County's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have twenty-one days from the filing date of this Order to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 , 48 because the parties pending Motions for Summary Judgment are based on the instant Complaint, these Motions are dismissed without prejudice as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply re 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Claims.( Replies due by 1/5/2017.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent a ny aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 3/15/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. v. Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S Carter
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Mona Kaveh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?