Patton et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charlene Patton and Thomas H. Patton, Jr.
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00244
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER. The Court's 32 Order is amended to reflect that plaintiffss 15 motion to amend the complaint was GRANTED and that plaintiffs' 7 motion to remand was DENIED as moot. This case remains remanded to state court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy of docket sheet and Order mailed to State Court - SLD)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Defendant's 15 Motion to Amend the Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Remand to State Court is Denied as moot. This case shall be remanded to the appropriate Nevada state court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: certified copy of Docket sheet and Order to State Court - SLD)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery. All discovery should be concluded within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that a hearing on the 20 Motion to Extend Time and 25 Motion to Seal is scheduled for 6/3/2016 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re Plaintiff's 19 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. The deposition of Charlene Patton scheduled for 5/20/2016 is stayed pending further order of the court. Responses to 19 due by 5/26/2016. No reply necessary. Motion Hearing re 19 Emergency Motion set for 6/3/2016 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Patton
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Cara M. Xidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Patton, Jr.
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Cara M. Xidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Pooja Kumar
Represented By: Jennifer N Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?