Cook v. Las Vegas NV Metropolitan Police Dept et al
Plaintiff: Jawvan E Cook
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas NV Metropolitan Police Dept and Bonnie Polly
Case Number: 2:2016cv00256
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER accepting ECF No. 21 Report and Recommendation, dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff must initiate a scheduling conference as required by Local Rule 26-1(a) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) no later than August 12, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the clerk shall re-issue a new summons. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall deliver a copy of the summons, the complaint (ECF No. 6 ), and the USM-285 form (ECF No. 11 ) to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDER ED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachments in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915( a); or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECF No. 1 ), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Las Vegas NV Metropolitan Police Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas NV Metropolitan Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawvan E Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?