Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Shenandoah Owners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC and Shenandoah Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00268
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 126 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER denying 139 Motion to Reopen Discovery; IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that PARTIAL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of Cross-claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC on its cross-claims against U.S. Bank Trust Company and Daniel L. Valvo. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 Stipulation to extend the deadline to file the joint pretrial order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. The Shenandoah Owners Association's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 102] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART: See Order for details. Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and SFR Investments Pool I, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF Nos. 103, 104] are DENIED; and SFR's Motion for Default Judgment [ECF No. 101] is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are ORDERED to a settlement conference with the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation. ALL CLAIMS AGAINST SunTrust Bank are DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. SunTrust's 83 motion to set aside default is deemed withdrawn as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified text on 1/14/2020 (EDS).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Re: 92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Any response to that motion must be filed by 8/19/19. Mr. Yergensen must serve a copy of this order on Nevada Association Services, Inc. and file a proof of service by 8/7/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Re: 86 Scheduling Order, Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 71 the motion to lift stay in which SFR joins 72 , is GRANTED IN PART, in that THE STAY IS LIFTED, but some of the other details and deadlines requested by the motion are denied or revised. Any party that has been ser ved with the complaint but has not yet answered it has until 5/24/19, to answer or otherwise respond to it. Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Remove Attorney from CM/ECF Service List. Attorney Rachel L. Wise terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Steven G. Shevorski, Pvt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the 54 Motion to Lift Stay is Denied without prejudice to the filing of a new motion after the Supreme Court rules on the Bourne Valley and Saticoy Bay petitions for certiorari review. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 03/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the sta y. Until that time, all proceedings in this action are stayed with one exception: this stay has no impact on any party's obligation to timely serve process and file proof of service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 09/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to seal Docket Nos. 34 , 35 , 36 , 37 , 40 , and 41 . No later than 8/19/16, SFR shall file on the public docket a properly redacted version of Docket Nos. 40 and 40 -1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 36 Motion for Service by Publication and Denying 37 Motion to Extend Time without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Under 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(b), I hereby certify to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada that the constitutionality of Chapter 116 has been called into question in these actions. The Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days to intervene in these actions if it so desires. FRCP 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV AG, Carson City/Las Vegas - MMM)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING SFR's 10 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Shenandoah Owners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenandoah Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?