Stevens v. Gentry et al
Plaintiff: Roberta Ann Stevens
Defendant: Brian Connett, Jo Gentry, Tanya Hill, Sherrie Horton, Jacobs Trading Company and Silver State Industries
Case Number: 2:2016cv00277
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Substitute Counsel is Granted. The Clerk of Court shall substitute M. Greg Mullanax, Esq. as counsel of record for Plaintiff Roberta Ann Stevens in place of Roberta Ann Stevens. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 01/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend Stay; granting 12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Ms. Ginapp shall file a notice explaining her representation status with Defendant Sherrie Horton within seven (7) days from the date of this order. The Stay is extended until 3/3/2017. Defendants shall file a version of the report form attached on or before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Ms. Ginapp shall file a substitution of counsel on or before Wednesday, December 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver State Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?