Ditech Financial, LLC v. Hollywood Highlands East Landscape Maintenance Association, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
Ditech Financial, LLC |
Defendant: |
Hollywood Highlands East Landscape Maintenance Association, Inc., Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00298 |
Filed: |
February 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 16, 2021 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting 108 Stipulation of Dismissal, with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the request to extend the litigation stay to March 12, 2021, to allow the remaining parties (BONYM and the HOA) t o complete and file a stipulated dismissal of the remaining claims 110 is GRANTED. BONYM and the HOA must file their stipulated dismissal by March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
October 12, 2020 |
Filing
101
ORDER denying without prejudice 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for details. ORDER granting 100 Stipulation to Stay Case Due to Settlement. THIS ACTION IS STAYED until 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
June 3, 2020 |
Filing
93
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Henry Diaz and Corina Diaz. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
May 20, 2020 |
Filing
91
ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. Motions due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 20, 2020 |
Filing
88
ORDER Granting 87 Motion to Extend Time Dispositive Motions Deadline. Motions due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 13, 2019 |
Filing
70
ORDER Re: 68 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/11/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER Granting 53 Motion to Remove Attorney Miles N. Clark from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER. The Court GRANTS the 45 motions to lift the stay, 47 to extend the deadline to effectuateservice, and 46 for service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing
44
ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying 27 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 13, 2016 |
Filing
39
ORDER that 34 Motion to Strike Ditech's Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE Ditech's Demand for Security of Costs (ECF No. 25 ). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
26
ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Ditech Financial, LLC answer due 6/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER. Under 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(b), I hereby certify to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada that the constitutionality of Chapter 116 has been called into question in these actions. The Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days to intervene in these actions if it so desires. FRCP 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV AG, Carson City/Las Vegas - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?