Oliver v. Bell Trans et al

Plaintiff: Cameron E. Oliver
Defendant: Brent J. Bell and Bell Trans
Case Number: 2:2016cv00305
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2018 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 75 Stipulation to Stay and Withdraw 56 Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) The 56 Motion for Circulation of Notice is DEEMED WITHDRAWN without prejudice; (2) The 63 , 64 stipulations for extension of time to resp ond to that motion, and the 70 Motion for Leave to File Supplement re: Reply are DENIED as moot; (3) The Court will address the 67 Motion to Strike 65 Motion for Sanctions in due course; and (4) This action is STAYED for all other purposes until 8/30/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 14, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation to Extend Time re 56 Motion (First Request). Replies due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Stipulation. The stay is extended (nunc pro tunc from January 9, 2018) to February 8, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties appear for a Status Conference on 2/12/2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 7, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Based on 52 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation is approved. The stay is extended (nunc pro tunc from 11/13/17) to 1/9/2018. If the stipulation and order to dismiss is not filed by 1/9/18, the parties must appear for a status conference on 1/12/18 at 9:30 a.m. If the stipulation and dismissal order is timely filed, it should include the instruction to vacate this status conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings (Eighth Request). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 31, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings (Seventh Request). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 28, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Continue Stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 19, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings in this action are STAYED through July 27, 2017, to allow the parties to prepare settlement documents. In light of the settlement, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions [29, [32, 33 are DENIED as moot and without prejudice to their prompt refiling should this settlement not be completed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 1, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 29 Motion (Second Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 11, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 34 the parties' stipulation to extend time is GRANTED. The time for the defendants to respond to 29 plaintiff's motion for circulation of notice is EXTENDED to 5/31/2017. The time for plaintiff to resp ond to 32 the defendants' motion for partial dismissal or, alternatively, for partial summary judgment is EXTENDED to 6/5/2017. And the time for plaintiff to respond to 33 the defendants' motion to certify a question of law to the Nevada Supreme Court is EXTENDED to 6/5/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 6, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Extend re: Discovery Deadlines. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 30, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation Staying Proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7 Bell Trans's Motion to Dismiss and 8 Motion to Certify Questions of Law to the Nevada Supreme Court are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days of the expiration of the stay. In the event that this case is not resolved during the Stay Period, new due dates for these motions should be included in the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation To Stay All Proceedings (Second Request ). Dispute shall be stayed starting on August 12, 2016, and ending October 23, 2016. See Order for furhter details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
April 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Defendants' failure to file and serve a signed statement as required in Order 3 Minute. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
April 8, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation re 8 MOTION to Certify Questions of Law to the Nevada Supreme Court and 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/22/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 24, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 8 MOTION to Certify Questions of Law to the Nevada Supreme Court. Responses due by 4/8/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Bell Trans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent J. Bell
Represented By: Rico Cordova
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Trans
Represented By: Rico Cordova
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron E. Oliver
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?