Ford et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Georgina Ford and Murray Ford
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00344
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re 110 Notice of Dismissal. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties and Order of the Court this case is dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting 107 Second Stipulation to Extend Time to File Notice of Dismissal. Deadline: 6/18/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is denied as to claims 3, 4, 5, and 7. Summary judgment is granted as to all other claims. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2018 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Amend Briefing Scheduling re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Supplement to Motion due by 4/7/2017. Responses due by 3/7/2017. Replies due by 3/21/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Granting 18 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgina Ford
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Daniel Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Ford
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Daniel Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Michael R Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?