Hendren v. Williams et al
Petitioner: |
Kenneth A. Hendren |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E. Williams |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00361 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
24
ORDER that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of the Court shall substitute Jo Gentry for Brian E. Williams, on the docket for this case, as the respondent warden, and shall update the caption of the action to reflect this change. FURTHER ORDERED that 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. The petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall ENTER JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER that 18 Motion for Waiver of compliance with LR IA 10-3 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as described in this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the order entered November 9, 2016 (ECF No. 19 ) is VACATED. The Clerk of the Court shall strike that order from the record. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend Time re 6 Petition. Replies due by 3/6/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER that 18 Motion for Waiver is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER that 12 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. Respondents shall have until and including November 3, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered on April 20, 2016 (ECF No. 5 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time re 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E. Williams answers due 9/19/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
5
ORDER that 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. The Clerk shall separately file the petition for writ of habeas corpus (attached to the application to proceed in forma pauperis, at ECF No. 1); add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents; and shall electronically serve upon respondents a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus and a copy of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 60 days from the date of entry of this orde r to appear in this action, and to answer or otherwise respond to the petition. FURTHER ORDERED that if respondents file an answer, petitioner shall have 60 days from the date on which the answer is served on him to file and serve a reply. If respon dents file a motion to dismiss, petitioner shall have 60 days from the date on which the motion is served on him to file and serve a response to the motion to dismiss, and respondents shall, thereafter, have 30 days to file a reply in support of the motion. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 3, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Petitioner shall have 45 days from the date this order is entered to have the filing fee of five dollars ($5) sent to the clerk of court. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall send petitioner two copies of this order. Petitioner is ordered to make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this order attached to the check sent to the court in payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?