The Bank of New York Mellon v. Paradise Court Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., Paradise Court Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00390
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 112 BNYM's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 119 BNYM's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 89 BNYM's Motion for Summary Judgment, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 85 HOA's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 90 SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SFR's claims for slander of title and injunctive relief are DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 85 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Replies due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 86 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 84 Order (First Request). Motions due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 72 Motion to Lift Stay (First Request). Replies due by 12/4/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT all pending motions are Denied without prejudice. Status Report due by 3/24/2017. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROTECTIVE ORDER DENIED re 52 Motion for Protective Order filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 8/5/2016 to correct ruling (DKJ).
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying without prejudice 33 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation for Cost Bond. BNY Mellon shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 25 Stipulation without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Court hereby Orders the parties to file, no later than May 13, 2016, a stipulation regarding posting a security. The Court further Orders the parties to file a discovery plan no later than May 20, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 4/11/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Paradise Court Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Court Homeowners Association
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Represented By: Timothy C. Pittsenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?