Bank of America, N.A. v. Antelope Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Antelope Homeowners' Association and Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00449
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that BANA's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. The HOA's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. The 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time is Granted nunc pro tunc to 11/18/2016. The 58 Stipulation to Stay the Case is Denied. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment against BANA and for the HOA and LVDG on BANA's quiet title claim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant Antelope Homeowners' Association's 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Remove Attorney Allison R. Schmidt from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to File Reply to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Replies due by 1/12/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 11/28/2016. Plaintiff's Replies due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Attorney H. Sunny Jeong and Remove Counsel from Service List. The Clerk of the Court shall unseal each of the Ex Parte Motions and make them available on the court's public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Antelope Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?