Simmons v. Verizon Management Pension Plan
Plaintiff: John Simmons, Sr.
Defendant: Verizon Management Pension Plan
Case Number: 2:2016cv00455
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 Case Management Report. The deadline to file dismissal documents or a joint status report explaining why dismissal documents have not been filed is extended to 2/17/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Seal exhibit 1 To Motion For Summary Judgment 17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 15 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is granted, in part. Motions due by 9/16/2016. Replies due by 11/7/2106. Responses due by 10/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Verizon Management Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Simmons, Sr.
Represented By: Kirsten G. Scott
Represented By: Patricia S Waldeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Management Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?