Desert Palace, Inc. v. Michael
Plaintiff: Desert Palace, Inc.
Defendant: Andrew P. Michael
Counter Defendant: Desert Palace, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Andrew P. Michael
Case Number: 2:2016cv00462
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Attorneys fees are awarded in favor of Desert Palace in the amount of $392,710.00. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Desert Palace, Inc. against Andrew P. Michael. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 169 partial motion for summary judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 170 partial motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/28/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER accepting and adopting 148 Report and Recommendation; Re: 170 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/13/2018. Replies due by 9/24/2018; Overruling 152 Objections. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 167 Stipulation to Amend Discovery Plan; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Extend Time; Discovery due by 6/28/2018. Motions due by 7/27/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 124 Motion for Sanctions (see order for details); FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel for Plaintiff shall, no later than 15 days from entry of this order, serve and file a memorandum. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's 124 Motion for Discovery Sanctions be granted as to (see order for details). Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 109 Motion to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Motions due by 3/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Denying without prejudice the parties' 106 Stipulation to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 93 Motion for Exemption; Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (888) 251-2909, access code 7771745 five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. The 8/30/2017 Settlement Conference is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that 89 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 84 Motion for Order to Show Cause is GRANTED. Defendant shall file his response no later than August 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 stipulation to extend time to file bill of costs and motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER on Motions for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to a magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference to resolve any remaini ng claims and issues. See order for details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) Modified text to reflect referral to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference on 6/22/2017 (RFJ).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulation to Extend Time re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Responses due by 3/28/2017., Replies due by 4/4/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Compel.; granting 49 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing. FURTHER ORDERED that discovery is stayed pending the decisions on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 23 ) and Defendant's Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 40 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Seal 46 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Opposition Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 37 the parties' Stipulation to Remove Plaintiff's Motion from Calendar is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that based on the parties stipulation, 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Seal re 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Exhibits 2-6 may be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim. The parties hereby stipulate and agree to extend Plaintiffs deadline to file a response to the Answer and Counterclaim for one week; specifically, that Plaintiffs deadline to file a response shall be extended up and through Monday, 4/11/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Palace, Inc. v. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Desert Palace, Inc.
Represented By: Oliver J Pancheri
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Palace, Inc.
Represented By: Oliver J Pancheri
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Andrew P. Michael
Represented By: Kenneth E Hogan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Hulet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew P. Michael
Represented By: Kenneth E Hogan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Hulet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?