Bank of America, N.A. v. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Bank of America, N.A., |
Defendant: |
Daisey Trust, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association |
Counter Defendant: |
Bank of America, N.A., |
Counter Claimant: |
Daisey Trust |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00467 |
Filed: |
March 3, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 22, 2019 |
Filing
95
ORDER approving ECF No. 94 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims against Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners' Association. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 18, 2019 |
Filing
89
ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on its first claim for relief and on Daisy Trust's counterclaims (ECF No. 77 ) is granted. Daisy Trust's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 79 ) is denied. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Associations motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 78 ) is granted in part and denied in part : It is granted with respect to Plaintiff's second and third claims for relief. It is denied as to the first claim for relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing
83
ORDER granting ECF No. 82 Stipulation : Responses to ECF Nos. 77 , 78 , 79 Motions for Summary Judgment due by 2/22/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing
73
ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Joint Status Report. Proposed Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
67
ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Motion to Stay Case; action temporarily stayed until resolution of the certified question in Nev. S. Ct. Case No. 72931; parties to file a status report within 5 days from such resolution; denying without prejudice ECF No. 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and may be refiled within 30 days from Supreme Court decision. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting ECF No. 52 Stipulation to Extend the Date for Daisey Trust to file its response to ECF No. 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Daisey Trust's response due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
30
ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
29
ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 27 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw. Attorney H. Sunny Jeong withdrawn from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?