The Bank of New York Mellon, v. Las Vegas Development Group LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Las Vegas Development Group LLC and Royal Highlands Street and Landscape Maintenance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00478
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 87 Motion to Amend Judgment. Replies due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 94 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 87 Motion to Amend. Responses due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Stipulation re: 87 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment. Replies due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 87 Motion to Amend/Correct re 85 Order. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 58 Magistrate Judge Foley's report and recommendation be and the same hereby is, REJECTED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 BNYM's motion for summary judgment be, an d the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 61 Royal's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Airmotive and LVDG's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 61 , 62 Motions for Summary Judgments. Replies due by 1/25/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 59 , 61 , 62 Motions for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 70 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 59 , 61 , 62 Motions for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Alessi & Koenig, LLC shall have until 9/14/18 to advise the Court if it will retain new local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Motions due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 50 the Court's Order is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Alessi & Koenig, LLC shall have until 9/3/18 to advise the Court if it will retain new local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Stipulation to extend Disclosure Deadlines; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 26 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/15/2018. Replies due by 4/12/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon, v. Las Vegas Development Group LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Development Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Highlands Street and Landscape Maintenance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Andrew M. Jacobs
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp, Pvt
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?