Barraza et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Nana I Am, Dinora Barraza and Miguel Barraza
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp, PNC Bank, National Association, The Golden Team Keller Williams Realty and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00484
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Jory C. Garabedian substituted for attorney Rebecca P. Kern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Defendant Green Tree's 42 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Defendants' 7 and 13 Motions to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter final judgment in favor of the defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barraza et al v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nana I Am
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinora Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Represented By: Rebecca P. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Golden Team Keller Williams Realty
Represented By: John A. Snow
Represented By: Brian C. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?