January 3, 2019 |
Filing
139
ORDER Granting 138 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Replies due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing
129
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 116 BANA's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 126 BANA's motion to file supplemental authorities be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 31, 2018 |
Filing
124
ORDER Granting 122 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 116 Motion to Amend/Correct. Replies due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing
120
ORDER Granting 113 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven T. Loizzi, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
119
ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Jesse A. Ransom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 18, 2018 |
Filing
111
ORDER Denying SFR's 88 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and BANA's 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The HOA's 92 Motion for Summary Judgment and SFR's 94 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER Granting 95 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Brett M Coombs terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER re 83 Status Report. The stay in this case is LIFTED. The parties shall file no later than 6/20/2017 a joint statement with a schedule for this case to proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 4, 2017 |
Filing
81
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 78 Motion to Stay Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by 4/11/17, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 21, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER Granting in part 79 Motion to Extend Time. ( Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2017., Motions due by 6/5/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
77
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 63 SFR's motion to certify be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER granting SFR's ECF No. 58 Motion for Leave to File an Opposition; granting in part and denying in part SFR's ECF No. 57 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 59 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
74
ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Siria L. Gutierrez withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
December 29, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER. In light of 70 the amended stipulation, 69 the stipulation is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
61
ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Miles N Clark terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 26, 2016 |
Filing
56
ORDER Granting 50 Motion for Protective Order and for Sanctions. To the extent counsel cannot agree among themselves as to the amount of sanctions that should be paid, Plaintiff shall file a Motion for the Calculation of Sanctions no later than 11/2/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 24, 2016 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Take Certain Deposition Outside the Close of Discovery and to Stay Dispositive Motion Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Remove Attorney Donna M. Wittig from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
August 2, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying 42 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Because the motion and memorandum for non-monetary status 44 46 fail to comply with the page limitations established in the local rules, they are hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
April 25, 2016 |
Filing
16
ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/6/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
April 14, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER Granting Defendant SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC.'s 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall post a security bond in the amount of $500 within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|