Bank of America, N.A. v. Lake Mead Court Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Lake Mead Court Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00504
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Carlos Nevarez re 110 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. SFR's 84 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied and SFR's 104 Motion to Strike is Denied. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 21 days of this Order's issuance identifying any remaining non-moot claims and how the parties intend to proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven T. Loizzi, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 83 and 84 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/3/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline Pending Ruling on Motion for Protective Order (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Stipulation; Re: 70 Motion for Protective Order, Replies due by 2/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying without prejudice the parties' 64 Second Amended Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a renewed joint proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 12/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation to Substitute Attorney Ashlie L. Surur as attorney of record in place of Adam H. Clarkson, Matthew J. McAlonis, and John W. Aylor for Lake Mead Court Homeowners Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that this case is administratively Stayed. All pending motions are Denied without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC shall care for, preserve, and maintain t he Property. Beginning on 3/20/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Lake Mead Court Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Mead Court Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?