Sica v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vincent J. Sica
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00513
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation to Vacate Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Extra Contractual Claims. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sica v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: James W. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent J. Sica
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?