Burton Jr v. Williams et al
Petitioner: |
Thayer Joseph Burton Jr |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian Williams |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00521 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER re 35 Suggestion of Death. The death renders this habeas action moot and this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDERED that 26 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Claims 4, 9, 18, 19, 20, 21, and 22 are dismissed from the amended petition (ECF No. 15 ) for the reasons set forth above. FURTHER ORDERED that respondent s shall have 60 days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve an answer to the remaining claims in the amended petition. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have 60 days from the date on which the answer is served on him to file and serve a reply. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 90 days from entry of this Order; Brian Williams answer due 90 days from entry of this Order; granting 14 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of answer to file reply. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/11/16 nunc pro tunc 7/25/2016 for 12 and 8/23/2016 for 14 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
May 3, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER that the Clerk shall ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 5 ) and a copy of this order on the respondents. The Clerk of the Court shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 20 days from the date of entry of this order to appear in this action, but are not required to respond to the petition until ordered to do so by the court. FURTHER ORDERED that 9 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file his amended petition on or before July 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date that this order is entered to have the filing fee of $5.00 sent to the clerk of the court. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall send petitioner two copies of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?