Bank of New York Mellon v. Southern Highlands Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Grey Spencer Dr Trust and Southern Highlands Community Association
Counter Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Counter Claimant: Grey Spencer Dr Trust
Case Number: 2:2016cv00523
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 73 plaintiff's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 57 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 defendant motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANT ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 defendant's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant GSDT shall submit a proposed judgment to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation to Extend Time re 63 MOTION to Strike 42 Jury Demand . ( Responses due by 11/17/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Southern Highlands Community Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Extend Time re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ( Responses due by 9/28/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Responses due by 8/18/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying 38 Stipulation to Stay due toAlessi's bankruptcy as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Jason Joseph Zummo terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Remove Attorney Allison R. Schmidt from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/09/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending the Resolution of the NRED Mediation. IT IS SO ORDERED that the current 3/29/16 deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be vacated and the litigation be stayed for sixty days from the date of this Order. (See order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Southern Highlands Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grey Spencer Dr Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Grey Spencer Dr Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?