Bank of America, N.A. v. Mountain Gate Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC, Mountain Gate Homeowners' Association and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6408 Hillside Brook
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Counter Claimant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6408 Hillside Brook
Case Number: 2:2016cv00540
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 97 BANA's "motion to amend and re-enter order and judgment" be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that BANA's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 65 ) be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Saticoy Bay's motion for summary judgme nt (ECF No. 66 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mountain Gate's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 67 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 65 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 66 Saticoy Bay's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 67 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Miles N Clark terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Motion To Withdraw And Remove Counsel From Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - The order to show cause (ECF No. 16 is DISCHARGED. Attorney Michael Bohn is CAUTIONED that repeating conduct (specified herein) in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Hampton & Hampton LLC to file amended declarations consistent with Kanter by no later than noon on June 9, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER setting a Hearing for 6/10/2016 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Iyad Haddad MUST be present in person at the hearing. The Court strongly encourages Mr. Haddad and his attorney to bring copies of officia l documentation showing the membership of Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6408 Hillside Brook and the sub-members of any person or entity with any direct membership interest in Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6408 Hillside Brook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Saticoy Bay to file, no later than May 17, 2016, a supplemental certificate of interested parties identifying its chain of ownership and the sub-members of any owning entity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/16/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/04/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Granting in Part and Denying in Part 13 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Mountain Gate Homeowners' Association answer due 5/5/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Mountain Gate Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Gate Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6408 Hillside Brook
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6408 Hillside Brook
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?